Birrell v. Banzhaf, et al.
Plaintiff: Bella-Christina Birrell
Defendant: Joyce Banzhaf and Kary Shender
Case Number: 2:2014cv01024
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/21/18: 57 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are ADOPTED in full. 55 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. (Kaminski, H)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/08/18 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion to dismiss, filed 12/26/17 55 be granted in part and denied in part. Specifically that: plaintiff's request to dismiss the complaint be granted pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), and plaintiff's request to waive the filing fee in the matter be denied. Motion to Dismiss 55 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/14/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/28/17 47 are ADOPTED in full; and Banzhaf's MOTION to DISMISS 42 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, with the result that Birrell's § 1983 claims against Banzhaf is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting in full 45 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/29/17. Defendant Bravo's 28 motion to dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Plaintiff's due process claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's 36 motion for sanctions is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/27/17 recommending that Banzhaf's motion to dismiss 42 be granted in part and denied in part, with the result that Birrell's section 1983 claims against Banzhaf be dismissed with prejudice. Motion to dismiss 42 referred t. referred to Judge John A. Mendez Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/2/2017 RECOMMENDING Bravo's 28 motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part, with the result that Birrell's due process claim be dismissed with prejudice; and Birrell's 36 motion for sanctions be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/8/16 GRANTING 23 Motion for court order; Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson is requested to take all steps necessary to enlist the assistance from the CDCR to obtain a serv ice address for defendant Banzhaf. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Ms. Anderson is requested to provide the address to the USM and so inform the court. If an address for defendant Banzhaf and/or the AVP cannot be located, Ms. Anderson shall so advise; The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General; and plaintiff is granted an additional 90 days in which to serve process on defendant Banzhaf.(Dillon, M)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/15/16 DIRECTING USM to serve * amended complaint * filed on * 2/4/15,* on * Landon Bravo* within 14 days. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff one USM-285 form; and within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the completed USM-285 form for defendant Banzhaf required to effect service. Clerk of the Court shall serve on plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules of Court.(Dillon, M)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER adopting in full 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/25/16. The following defendants are dismissed from this action without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1): Shender, Cerda, Dovichi, Sewell, Grijalva, Sandoval, Volunteers of Vacaville, and California Medical Facility. (Kastilahn, A)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/19/2016 ORDERING that service is appropriate for Joyce Banzhaf and Landon Bravo. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned w ithin 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the defendants Shender, Cerda, Dovichi, Sewell, Grijalva, Sandoval, Volunteers of Vacaville, and California Medical Facility be dismissed from this action without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/09/14 ordering plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be collec ted in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed on her first amended complaint 7 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to shorten discovery response time 5 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the filing date of this order to file a second amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birrell v. Banzhaf, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bella-Christina Birrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Banzhaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kary Shender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?