Malott v. Placer County et al
Plaintiff: Richard Malott
Defendant: Placer County, Nevada County, Sacramento County, Ken Addsion, Devon Bell, Edward Bonner, Javier Bustamante, Dave DeVogelaire, Darin Epperson, Mark Fain, Matt Hardcastle, Michelle Hendricks, Scott Jones, Donna Nelson, Keith Royal and Joe Salivar
Case Number: 2:2014cv01040
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/23/17 ORDERING that the deadline to file disposition documents is EXTENDED until 6/1/2017. (Becknal, R)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/8/2017 ORDERING that the deadline to file disposition documents is EXTENDED to 5/22/2017. (Zignago, K.)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SUMMARY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/6/17: Defendant Ken Addison's motion for protective order 103 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant Ken Addison's deposition shall not be video recorded, but may be stenographically and/or audio recorded. (Kaminski, H)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/23/2017 ORDERING that the Court hereby orders that Defendant Ken Addison's 103 motion for protective order be heard on shortened time and that the hearing occur on 3/1/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 8. The parties' shall file their joint statement by no later than 12:00 p.m. on 2/24/2017. (Zignago, K.)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/15/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/3/16 ORDERING that the Objections 89 is SUSTAINED IN PART; the Court's prior order, ECF No. 38 , dismissed the original Complaint's second claim with prejudice and without leave to amend, and dismissed the original complaints fourth, seventh and eighth claims without prejudice but without leave to amend. The status (pretrial scheduling) order, ECF No. 86 , is hereby amended to this extent. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/11/2016 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part defendants' 64 66 Motions to Dismiss. Sacramento County and Placer County defendants' Motions to Dismiss plaintiff's claim for con spiracy are both GRANTED, with leave to amend. Defendant Hardcastle's Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's claim on the grounds of qualified immunity is DENIED. The Motions of defendants Addison and Placer County to dismiss plaintiff's claim for illegal and unreasonable search in violation of California Civil Code section 52.1 are GRANTED, with leave to amend. The Motions of defendants Addison and Placer County to dismiss plaintiff's claim for threat of arrest warrant in violation of California Civil Code section 52.1 are GRANTED, with leave to amend. Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint is due within 21 days from date of Order. (Marciel, M)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/17/15 ORDERING as follows: 1. The Sacramento County defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim against defendant Epperson arising out of the use of excessive force is DENIED. 2. The S acramento County defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's conspiracy claim against defendants Bustamante, Epperson, Hendricks is GRANTED with leave to amend. 3. The Nevada County defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim of conspiracy against defendant Nevada County is GRANTED with prejudice. 4. The Nevada County defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim of conspiracy against defendant DeVogelaere is GRANTED with leave to amend. 5. Plaintiff's third amended complaint is due within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. 6. This order resolves ECF Nos. 47, 50. (Becknal, R)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on November 14, 2014. The motion to dismiss filed by the Sacramento County defendants, ECF No. 22 , is denied as to claim six; granted without leave to amend as to claims two, four, seven and eight; and gran ted with leave to amend as to claims one, five, and twenty; The motion to dismiss filed by the Nevada County defendants, ECF No. 27 , is granted without leave to amend as to claim eleven; and granted with leave to amend as to claims five, nine, ten, eighteen, nineteen and twenty; and The amended complaint is due within twenty one days of the date of this order. (Rivas, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malott v. Placer County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Malott
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada County
Represented By: Scott A. McLeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Addsion
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Bell
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Bonner
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Bustamante
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave DeVogelaire
Represented By: Scott A. McLeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Epperson
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fain
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hardcastle
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Hendricks
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Nelson
Represented By: Scott A. McLeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Royal
Represented By: Scott A. McLeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Salivar
Represented By: Scott A. McLeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?