USA v. Approximately $538,155.00 seized from ING Direct checking account # 156773818 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2011 Audi A5 Convertible, VIN: WAULFAFH9BN009524, New Jersey License Plate: W98ARP, 2013 Blue Porsche Panamera, VIN: WPOAB2A71DL060573, New Jersey License Plate: 2012ROJ, Approximately $538,155.00 seized from ING Direct checking account # 156773818, 2011 Ferrari California Convertible, VIN: ZFF65 LJA0B 01766 22, New Jersey License Plate: NOTOUCH and Approximately $10,002.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2014cv01048
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/11/14 re 13 Request. (Meuleman, A)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/27/14. Joint status report due 8/29/14. (Manzer, C)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/28/14 ORDERING that these actions are related. (Kastilahn, A)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/5/2014 ORDERING 1 Plaintiffs application for publication is APPROVED. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $538,155.00 seized from ING Direct checking account # 156773818 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Audi A5 Convertible, VIN: WAULFAFH9BN009524, New Jersey License Plate: W98ARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 Blue Porsche Panamera, VIN: WPOAB2A71DL060573, New Jersey License Plate: 2012ROJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $538,155.00 seized from ING Direct checking account # 156773818
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Ferrari California Convertible, VIN: ZFF65 LJA0B 01766 22, New Jersey License Plate: NOTOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $10,002.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Represented By: Michael Dwight Anderson, GOVT(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?