July 25, 2016 |
Filing
63
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/22/16 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Filing
61
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/20/16 ORDERING: Dispositive Motions filed by 8/9/2016; Dispositive Motions to be heard on 9/6/16 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; and Jury Trial set for 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Washington, S)
|
May 2, 2016 |
Filing
54
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/2/16 ORDERING that the Dispositive Motions deadline is extended to 6/21/2016, and the Dispositive Motions hearing is extended to 7/19/2016 at 1:30 p.m. The Final Pretrial Conference is extended to 8/26/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The Jury Trial is extended to 9/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
50
STIPULATION and ORDER for extension of deadlines and hearings signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/23/16. The Discovery is EXTENDED to 4/11/2016. Dispositive Motions are now due on 5/3/2016. The Dispositive Motion Hearings currently set for notice on 4/5/2016 will now be set for 5/31/2016 at 1:30 PM. Joint Pretrial Statements are now due on 6/24/2016. Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 7/1/2016 at 11:00 AM, and Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 8/1/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
|
January 21, 2016 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/21/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 40 Motion to award further sanctions is GRANTED. Within thirty days defendants shall pay sanctions to plaintiff in the amount of $2,500, as ordered on 10/13/2015, as well as a further sanction of $4,000. Within thirty days Attorney Eliyahu Kaplunovsky shall pay sanctions to plaintiff in the amount of $1,000. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing
38
STIPULATION and ORDER 37 for extension of deadlines and hearings signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/20/2015. The Discovery is EXTENDED to 2/22/2016. Dispositive Motions are now due 3/8/2016. The Dispositive Motion Hearings currently set for not ice on 12/10/2015 will now be set for 4/5/2016 at 9:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 5/13/2016 at 11:00 AM and Jury Trial is RESCHEDULED for 6/13/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM). Joint Pretrial Statements are now due 5/6/2016. (Marciel, M)
|
October 13, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/9/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 31 motion to compel and award of sanctions is GRANTED. Defendants shall produce responses to the discovery at issue within ten days of the date of this order. Defendants shall pay sanctions to plaintiff in connection with the bringing of the motion in the amount of $2,500 within 60 days of the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing
28
STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING DATES signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 07/02/15 ORDERING that the dates are EXTENDED as follows: Discovery due by 9/11/2015; Dispositive Motions filed by 9/21/2015 and heard 10/21/15 at 9:30 a.m.; Pretrial Conference reset for 1/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez with a joint pretrial conference statement due 12/30/15; Jury Trial reset for 2/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A)
|
April 17, 2015 |
Filing
26
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/17/15 ORDERING that discovery is due by 8/10/2015, dispositive motions due by 8/19/2015, the hearing on dispositive motions shall be noticed for 9/16/2015 at 9:30 a.m., the Pretrial Con ference is SET for 12/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez, the joint pretrial statement due by 11/27/2015, and the Jury Trial is SET for 1/25/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
|
March 23, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/20/2015 GRANTING 12 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, effective 4/10/2015; STAYING this action until 4/10/2015; RELIEVING Attorney Dennis R. Murphy and Murphy Austin Adams and Schoenfeld LLP as counsel of r ecord for Defendants U.S.A. Trucking, Inc. and Gurtej Singh, effective 4/10/2015; ORDERING that the attorney remain as attorney of record, for purposes of granting time for the defendants to seek new counsel, until 4/10/2015; ORDERING the defendants to retain substitute counsel by 4/10/2015, CAUTIONING that a corporation may not represent itself without counsel, and without counsel, default may be entered against the corporation; ORDERING that the plaintiff not file or pursue any discovery durin g the period the Court allotted the defendants to attain new counsel; ALLOWING the plaintiff to pursue any planned or pending discovery motions after 4/10/2015; INFORMING the plaintiff that he may file an Ex Parte Motion to extend the discovery deadline, the pretrial conference date and the trial date, as necessary. (Michel, G.)
|