Gentle v. Montago
Petitioner: Antoine Marquise Gentle
Respondent: F. Montago, Michell Fox, Robert Duncan and L. P. Zamora
Case Number: 2:2014cv01173
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/16/15 ordering ( Settlement Conference set for 8/31/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.) Parties are directed to submit confidential settlement s tatements no later than 08/21/15 to ckdorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff may mail his confidential settlement statement to U.S. District Court, Attn: ADR Division, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, CA, 95814 so it arrives no later than 08/21/15. (See order for further details)(cc: CKD). (Plummer, M)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/23/15. On the stipulation of the parties filed on June 22, 2015, the stay entered on May 28, 2015, is hereby lifted.(Becknal, R)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/28/15 ORDERING that the Parties request for a thirty-day stay pending finalization and filing of required settlement documents, is GRANTED. This Court shall maintain jurisdiction over this matter. The Parties shall file the appropriate Stipulated Dismissals or request to lift this stay within thirty days of this order. All currently scheduled hearings are vacated. (Dillon, M)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/30/15 ORDERING that a settlement conference has been set for June 3, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom #24 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney at the U. S. District Court, 501 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814. Parties are directed to submit confidential settlement statements no later than 5/27/15 to ckdorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (see order for more details) (cc CKD)(Dillon, M)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Antoine Marquise Gentle signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/17/2014. Plaintiff's 8 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fe e. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentle v. Montago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antoine Marquise Gentle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F. Montago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michell Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. P. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?