Nunez v. Naseer et al
Plaintiff: Confesor Nunez
Defendant: Naseer, C. Smith and W. David Smiley
Case Number: 2:2014cv01180
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/30/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's requests for appointment of counsel (ECFNos. 27 , 35 ) are DENIED. It is RECOMMENDED that defendants' motions for summary judgment (ECF No. 29 , 30 ) be granted; and Judgment be entered for defendants. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/16 GRANTING 42 Motion for Extension of time. Defendant Naseers reply to the opposition to the motion for summary judgment is due by September 23, 2016.(Dillon, M)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/28/16 ordering the court hereby approves the substitution of attorney filed by Nasser, M.D. substituting Janine K. Jeffery of Reily & Jeffery, Inc. in place and instead of Martha P. Ehlenbach. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Confesor Nunez signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/29/14. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Naseer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confesor Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naseer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. David Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?