Burley et al v. OneWest Bank, FSB et al
Plaintiff: Silvia Burley and The California Valley Miwok Tribe
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB, Meridian Foreclosure Service and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv01349
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1362
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER 51 52 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/28/2015: Initial disclosures to be served by October 1, 2015. Disclosure of experts and produce reports by November 17, 2015. Expert testimony intended solely for reb uttal, experts to be disclosed and reports produced by December 21, 2015. All discovery, including depositions for preservation of testimony shall be completed by February 16, 2016. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, to be filed on or before April 4, 2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for June 20, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury trial is set for August 16, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Counsel shall comply with the procedures outlined in the Court's Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order issued April 8, 2015 (Docket No. 50). (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/9/2015 DENYING 35 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/5/2015 GRANTING 41 plaintiff's counsel's request to appear by telephone at the Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint set for 2/9/2015 at 2:00 p.m. The Courtroom Deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/28/2015 GRANTING 37 defendants' counsel's request to appear by telephone at the Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint set for 2/9/2015 at 2:00 p.m. The Courtroom Deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER 33 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/23/2014 resetting the Scheduling Conference for 4/13/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 3/30/2015. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/2/2014 GRANTING 22 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING the plaintiffs twenty days to file a second amended complaint. (Michel, G)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/26/2014 GRANTING 28 Plaintiffs counsel's request for telephonic appearance at the motion hearing set for 12/1/2014 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall e-mail counsel instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/24/2014 GRANTING 26 Defendants' request to appear by telephone at the Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint set for 12/1/2014 at 2:00 p.m. The Courtroom Deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER 20 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/24/2014 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 1/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 12/22/2014. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/25/14: This action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs have twenty days to file an amended Complaint, if they can do so consistent with this Order.(Kaminski, H)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/31/2014 ORDERING within 10 days of the date of this order counsel for all parties are to show cause why the first action, OneWest Bank, FSB v. Burley,2:14-CV-1349 WBS EFB, should not be dismissed, and why the second action, Burley v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, 2:14-CV-1567 WBS EFB, should not be remanded to San Joaquin County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Counsel for all parties shall submit separate statements identifying the basis, if any, for subject matter jurisdiction. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burley et al v. OneWest Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Burley
Represented By: Gary Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The California Valley Miwok Tribe
Represented By: Gary Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Lukasz Iwo Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Foreclosure Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Lukasz Iwo Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?