Iegorova v. Obama
Plaintiff: Liudmyla Iegorova
Defendant: Barack Obama
Case Number: 2:2014cv01415
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/3/2015 DENYING 12 Motion for Reconsideration construed as a Request for Relief from Judgment. (Michel, G.)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/14/15 RECOMMENDING that the 1 Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend; referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/12/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff has 30 days from date of service of Order to file an Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iegorova v. Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liudmyla Iegorova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?