Wood v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Charles Wood
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01421
Filed: June 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/20/16: Defendant's motion to exclude Dr. Reddy's expert testimony on causation is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to exclude Dr. Rapaski's testimony on causation also is GRANTED. This order resolves ECF Nos. 21 and 32. (Kaminski, H)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/1/2015. In a 21 Motion filed on 11/5/2015, defendant Southwest Airlines Co. requests Court prohibit Dr. Vinay Reddy and Dr. Stephen Rapaski from testifying as to their opinions concernin g cause of plaintiff Charles Wood's alleged injuries, including any apportionment as between different causes. The Court is contemplating continuation of Motion Hearing to the same date as Final Pretrial Conference set for January 2016. Defendants counsel is ordered to SHOW CAUSE on or before close of business on 12/2/2015 as to why this 21 Motion cannot appropriately be heard as the Court contemplates. (Marciel, M)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/13/15 ORDERING that 17 The State Funds application for a first lien in the amount to be determined after the payment of plaintiffs litigation expenses and attorneys fees is hereby GRANTED. (Benson, A)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/12/15 ORDERING that the Stipulation Regarding Neurological Examination of Plaintiff is approved. (Becknal, R)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/4/14 ORDERING that the initial disclosures shall be completed by 11/10/2014. All discovery shall be completed by 10/1/2015. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/1/201 5, and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 7/1/2015. All expert discovery shall be completed by 10/1/2015. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no late r than 10/9/2015. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 1/7/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall confer and file a joint pretrial conference statement by 12/17/2015. The Jury Trial is SET for 2/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties estimate a trial length of approximately five (5) days. Trial briefs are due by 2/8/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/16/14 ORDERING that Claimant's Application for a First Lien in the amount to be determined after the payment of Plaintiff's litigation expenses and Attorney's fees is GRANTED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/14/14 ORDERING that this case be related to case number 2:14-cv-1435 MCE CKD and that the related case be reassigned from Chief Judge England to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; as the Magistrate Judge assigned to both cases is the same, no reassignment is necessary. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:14-cv-1435 KJM CKD. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustments in the case assignment.(Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wood
Represented By: Edward Allen Schade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?