Vickers v. Hill
Petitioner: Tarrance Vickers
Respondent: Rick Hill
Case Number: 2:2014cv01425
Filed: June 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CJA 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/27/17 nun pro tunc 12/21/17. Attorney Barry Morris for Tarrance Vickers added. (Benson, A.)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/26/17 ORDERING that a certificate of appealability is ISSUED in the present action. (Kastilahn, A)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/29/2016 RECOMMENDING respondent's 20 motion to dismiss be granted and that this action be dismissed with prejudice because the court lacks federal habeas jurisdiction over petitioner's claims. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL 15 Findings and Recommendtions signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/9/15 GRANTING 10 Motion to Dismiss, but the Court allows petitioner leave to amend. The court DECLINES to issue the certificate of appealability. Amended Complaint due by 7/13/2015. (Meuleman, A)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/29/15 RECOMMENDING that 10 Motion to Dismiss be granted; and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickers v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tarrance Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Hill
Represented By: Krista Leigh Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?