Supinger v. Sallie Mae, Inc./Navient
Plaintiff: Jack Supinger
Defendant: Sallie Mae, Inc./Navient
Case Number: 2:2014cv01495
Filed: June 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER 25 for Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/26/2015. This action is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice. Each party will bear its own fees and costs. (Marciel, M)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/17/2015 ORDERING 21 Defendant Navient Solutions Inc's motion for judgment on the pleadings or summary judgment, is DENIED without prejudice as mooted by the settlement; and the hearing on defendant's motion is VACATED from the undersigned's calendar for 4/16/2015. (Reader, L)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/27/2014 DISMISSING related cases 2:14-cv-1607 and 2:14-cv-1894 without prejudice. Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint in 2:14-cv-1495 which contains all of his allegations. Defendant shall file an answer to the second amended complaint within 21 days after being served with the second amended complaint.(Donati, J)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE 11 signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/9/2014. to Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. The actions denominated 2:14-cv-1607 MCE CKD PS and 2:14-CV-1894 MCE DAD PS are REASSIGNED from Magistra te Judges Delaney and Drozd respectively to Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Henceforth, the caption on all documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as No. 2:14-CV-1607 MCE GGH PS and 2:14-CV-1894 MCE GGH PS. Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment to compensate for reassignment. (Marciel, M)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/6/2014 ORDERING the parties to show cause, in writing, within fourteen days, why the joint status report has not been filed, or to file their joint status report. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supinger v. Sallie Mae, Inc./Navient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Supinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae, Inc./Navient
Represented By: Debbie P. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?