Garder III v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Edgar Gardner, III |
Defendant: |
Nationstar Mortgage LLC and RSM&A Foreclosure Services, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01583 |
Filed: |
July 3, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Carolyn K. Delaney |
Presiding Judge: |
Troy L. Nunley |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
23
STIPULATION and ORDER 22 for Dismissal signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/17/2015. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. (Marciel, M)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing
21
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/23/2015 ORDERING the plaintiff to file and serve the First Amended Complaint by 5/14/2015. (Michel, G.)
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/9/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff has until 4/23/2015 to file and serve the First Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/25/2015 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to claim 1 (breach of implied covenant of good faith ); claim 2 (California Civil Code § 2923.5); claim 3 (intentional misrepresentation); claim 4 (unfair and deceptive business practices); claim 5 (Californias UCL); claim 6 (cancellation of instruments); claim 8 (declaratory relief); and claim 9 (injunctive relief). Plaintiff is given leave to amend these claims. Defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED with respect to claim 7, to the extent plaintiff states a claim under Cal. Civ. Code § 2924.10. Otherwise, the 4 Motion to di smiss is GRANTED with respect to Cal. Civ. Code §§ 2924.11, 2923.7, 2924.17, and 2924(a)(6), which are also cited in this cause of action. Plaintiff is given leave to amend claim 7. Plaintiff shall file and serve a First Amended Complaint w ithin 14 days of entry of this Order. The First Amended Complaint should comply with Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 8, which requires "a short and plain statement" of plaintiff's entitlement to relief. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading within 21 days of service of the First Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/16/2014 DENYING 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Reader, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?