California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Northern Recycling & Waste Services et al
Plaintiff: |
California Sportfishing Protection Alliance |
Defendant: |
Northern Recycling & Waste Services and Douglas Speicher |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01601 |
Filed: |
July 7, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Carolyn K. Delaney |
Presiding Judge: |
Garland E. Burrell |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
33 U.S.C. § 1319 Clean Water Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 16, 2015 |
Filing
20
STIPULATION and ORDER re CONSENT AGREEMENT signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/16/15. CASE CLOSED.(Kaminski, H)
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/28/15 ORDERING a dispositional document shall be filed no later than 7/24/15. Failure to respond by this deadline may be construed as consent to dismissal of this action without prejudice, and a dismissal order could be filed. Further, a Status Conference is scheduled for hearing at 9:00 a.m. on August 17, 2015, in the event no dispositional document is filed, or if this action is not otherwise dismissed. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference in which the parties shall address all pertinent subjects set forth in Local Rule 240. (Becknal, R)
|
March 5, 2015 |
Filing
15
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/5/15 re: 14 ORDERING that an answer or other responsive pleading must be filed on or before 3/20/15 in order to avoid a default. (Meuleman, A)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/18/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to SET ASIDE Judgment for excusable neglect 7 is GRANTED. The Judgment 6 is VACATED and the Order 5 is rescinded. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/20/2014 DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing
4
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/16/2014. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing and not later than 10/27/2014, why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel. If requested, a OSC Hearing will be set on 1/26/2015 at 9:00 AM prior to Status Conference. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to Status Hearing. Further, plaintiff is notified under Rule 4(m) of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that failure to serve defendants Northern R ecycling & Waste Services and Douglas Speicher with process within 120-day period prescribed in that Rule may result in unserved defendant(s) and/or action being dismissed. To avoid dismissal, on or before 11/7/2014, plaintiff shall file Proof of Service for these defendants or a sufficient explanation why service was not completed within prescribed service period. (Marciel, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?