Wilcox v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tammy J. Wilcox
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv01636
Filed: July 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/1/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 14 ) is denied; Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 17 ) is granted; and the Commissioner's decision is affirmed. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER 15 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2015. Defendant have until 5/27/2015 to respond to plaintiff's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties further stipulation that Court's 6 Scheduling Order shall be MODIFIED accordingly. (Marciel, M)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/16/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 3 application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment for social security case. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order upon the United States Marshal (USM). Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the required documents for service of process. Within five (5) days after submitting the necessary documents to the USM for service of process, plaintiff shall file in this court a declaration stating the date on which the documents were submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve process and copies of the necessary documents without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A) (cc: USM) Modified on 10/17/2014 (Kastilahn, A).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy J. Wilcox
Represented By: Marc V. Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?