Johnson v. Bourbeau, et al.
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: John Paul Bourbeau and Taqueria Yvette, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01730
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/28/18 ORDERING that the Debtor Examination of John Paul Bourbeau, set for hearing on November 28, 2018, be vacated. (Kaminski, H)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/06/2018 ORDERING Defendant's 66 Ex Parte Application is GRANTED. The Judgment Debtor Exam previously set for hearing on 11/7/2018 is CONTINUED to 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Cannarozzi, N)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/12/18, ORDERING that the Judgment Debtor Exam is CONTINUED to 11/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/12/2018. The Judgment Debtor Exam, previously set for hearing on 7/11/2018, is ordered CONTINUED to 9/12/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Cannarozzi, N)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/6/18 ORDERING that the Debtor Examination Re 52 Enforcement of Judgment of John Paul Bourbeau is CONTINUED to 7/11/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/15/2018 ORDERING John Paul Bourbeau to appear at the Judgment Debtor Exam set for 6/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Hunt, G)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DEFAULT JUDGMENT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/12/2018 GRANTING Judgment in favor of plaintiff Scott Johnson and against John Paul Bourbeau, Taqueria Yvette, Inc. in the amount of $8000 in statutory damages, $7,360 in attorneys' fees, and $440 in costs totaling $15,800. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/8/2017 GRANTING 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards Plaintiff $7,360.00 in attorney's fees and $440.00 in costs, for a total of $7,800.00. (Hunt, G)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/27/2017 ORDERING 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (Reader, L)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 03/14/16 GRANTING 22 Ex Parte Application to set OSC/Status Conference. Status Conference set for 4/5/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Jackson, T)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/18/16: The deadline to file Dismissal is extended to March 14, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/24/2015. (Michel, G.)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/7/15 ORDERING that the stipulation is approved. Defendant Taqueria Yvette, Inc. shall respond to all outstanding discovery requests not withdrawn by Plaintiff within 14 days of the date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bourbeau, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul Bourbeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taqueria Yvette, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?