Giraldes v. Beard
Plaintiff: Larry Giraldes
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Case Number: 2:2014cv01780
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/22/17. (Plummer, M)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/3/2017 DENYING 54 Motion for Summary Judgment and 62 Motion to Strike as moot; and DISMISSING action without prejudice for mootness. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/19/2016 ORDERING plaintiff's opposition to defendant's 54 motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 11/28/2016; and defendant's reply, if any, shall be filed on or before 12/12/2016. (Yin, K)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/13/16 denying 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Plummer, M)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/20/16 ORDERING that the hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 6/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Defendant's Opposition is due on or before May 18, 2016; and Plaintiff's Reply, if any, is due on or before June 1, 2016.(Dillon, M)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/8/16 DENYING 41 Motion for leave of court. (Dillon, M)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/16/2015 GRANTING the parties' 37 joint motion to modify the scheduling order; the parties may conduct discovery until 12/31/2015, any motions to compel discovery shall be filed by that date; dispositive motions due on or before 2/15/2016. All other scheduling deadlines remain unchanged. (Yin, K)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/2/15 ORDERING that plaintiffs pro se motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 33 ) is DENIED.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/26/15 denying 29 Motion for substitution of counsel. The discovery deadline in this action is extended to 10/14/15. The dispositive motion deadline in this action is extended to 12/18/15. (Plummer, M)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/11/2015 ORDERING plaintiff's counsel shall file a response to plaintiff's assertions, within 30 days.(Yin, K)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/13/2015 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Alan J. Reinach is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/30/15 ordering that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 19 and motion to compel 21 are denied without prejudice to renewal. (Plummer, M)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/10/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for the appointment of counsel 17 is granted. Alan J. Reinach is appointed as counsel in the above entitled matter. Appointed counsel shall notify Suj ean Park he has any questions related to the appointment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Alan J. Reinach. The March 29, 2015 discovery deadline is hereby vacated. Within thirty days of this order, the parties shall notify the court of any jointly proposed discovery schedule or their failure to reach agreement on same.(Dillon, M)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/27/2015 and stipulated between the parties to EXTEND time to complete discovery; discovery due by 3/29/2015; any motions necessary to compel discovery shall be filed by that date; all other scheduling deadlines remain unchanged. (Yin, K)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/22/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Larry Giraldes and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial). (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giraldes v. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Giraldes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?