Humphrey v. United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Andy Humphrey |
Defendant: |
United Healthcare Services, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01792 |
Filed: |
July 30, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 24, 2020 |
Filing
55
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/23/2020 ORDERING that cases 2:13-cv-02206-MCE-EFB, 2:14-cv-01792-MCE-EFB and 2:20-cv-01129-WBS-CKD are RELATED. the action denominated 2:20-cv-01129-WBS-CKD is REASSIGNED to Sen ior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and to Chief Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:20-cv-01129-MCE-EFB. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/29/14 ORDERING the Court has considered United Healthcare Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion toConsolidate and Stay and the parties' submissions and that Motion is GRANTED. Accordin gly, it is ORDERED that this matter is CONSOLIDATED with Matlock v. United Healthcare Services, Inc., No. 2:13-cv-02206-MCE-EFB, and that the consolidated action is STAYED pending resolution of United's Petition currently pending before the Fe deral Communications Commission. The parties in both cases comprising this consolidated action are ordered to file a joint status report in compliance with the Courts order electronically filed in the Matlock action on October 14, 2014 (ECF No. 34 ). (Becknal, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?