Perrie v. Perrie

Plaintiff: Sally Perrie
Defendant: Kenneth Allan Perrie
Case Number: 2:2014cv01872
Filed: August 8, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/6/16 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 29 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, and plaintiff is hereby informed that she may file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). (Jackson, T)
March 21, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/18/2016. Court is GRANTING defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's 13 First Amended Complaint. Court has provided plaintiff with previous opportunities to amend and finds she is un able to allege facts that would allow her to bring instant claims. See Gardner v. Marino, 563 F.3d 981, 990 (9th Cir. 2009) (finding no abuse of discretion in denying leave to amend when amendment would be futile). Therefore, defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. (Marciel, M)
June 19, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/18/15 GRANTING 4 Motion to Dismiss. The Court is not convinced that Plaintiff can cure the deficiencies in the complaint through am endment. However, in the event that Plaintiff can allege facts that would support these claims being excluded from the bankruptcy estate, the Court shall allow Plaintiff the opportunity to file an amended complaint. Should Plaintiff elect to do so, it must be filed with this Court within 21 days from the entry of this order. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrie v. Perrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Perrie
Represented By: Carl Joseph Schwedler(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Allan Perrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?