Hard v. Bank of New York Mellon et al
Plaintiff: |
Keith Hard |
Defendant: |
Bank of New York Mellon and First Horizon Home Loan Corporation |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01948 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Butte |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig M. Kellison |
Presiding Judge: |
Troy L. Nunley |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 3, 2019 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/2019 EXTENDING discovery completion date to 2/19/2019 and expert disclosure due date to 4/21/2019. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 10, 2018 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/9/18 GRANTING 34 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action for Wrongful Foreclosure: Defendants are afforded twenty-one (21) days from entry of this Order to answer the SAC. (Kaminski, H)
|
May 5, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/4/16 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS's 21 is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. The Court orders the following: Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's First Cause of Action is DENIED; Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action is DENIED; Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action pursuant to breach of contract is DENIED and GRANTED pursu ant to tort with leave to amend; Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Cause of Action is DENIED; Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action is DENIED; Defendants' request to dismiss Plain tiff's Sixth Cause of Action is GRANTED with leave to amend; Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action is GRANTED with leave to amend; and Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's Eighth Cause of Action is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiff is hereby granted leave to file a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days from entry of this Order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/25/2015 ORDERING Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT; Plaintiff shall file his proposed amended complaint within 10 days of the entry of this Order 16 ; and Defendants shall have 21 days from the date Plaintiff files the first amended complaint to file a responsive pleading. (Reader, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?