Jaeger v. Rite Aid Corporation

Plaintiff: Mark Jaeger
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv01960
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/22/2018 DISMISSING Case with prejudice. Each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
March 5, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/5/2018 APPROVING 61 Stipulation, EXTENDING Dispositive motion deadline to 3/15/2018, and CONTINUING Hearing on such motion to 4/24/2018, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. (York, M)
September 12, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/12/17 ORDERING that the deadlines are EXTENDED as follows: The close of Discovery is EXTENDED from 9/29/17, to 12/29/2017; The Dispositive Motion deadline is EXTENDED from 12/8/17, to 3/8/2018. The dispositive Motion hearing date is CONTINUED from 1/9/18, to 4/9/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/25/2017 FINDING that this action is related to the action denominated 2:17-cv-01527 MCE CKD within the meaning of Local Rule 123; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. (Michel, G.)
June 15, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/14/2017 ORDERING that discovery be completed by 9/29/2017; ORDERING that dispositive motions be filed by 12/8/2017 and noticed for hearing on 1/9/2018. (Michel, G.)
March 22, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/21/17 ORDERING that the deadlines in the following cases are extended as follows: the close of Discovery is EXTENDED from 4/28/17, to 7/28/17; the Dispositive Motion deadline is EXT ENDED from 7/11/17, to 10/10/17; and the Dispositive Motion Hearing date is CONTINUED from 8/8/17, to 11/7/17 at 1:30 p.m. This order applies only to the following related cases: 2:13-CV-02439 JAM-EFB; 2:14-CV-01946 JAM-EFB; 2:14-CV-01960 JAM -EFB; 2:15-CV-00623 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02150 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02396 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01748 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02597 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01872 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01874 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02594 JAM-EFB; 2:16-CV-00174 JAM-EFB; 2:16-CV-00211 JAM-EFB; and 2:16-CV-01028 JAM-EFB. (Becknal, R)
June 22, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/2016 ORDERING that Rite Aid Corporation's objections to the Court's 6/9/2016 Status Order (Doc #47-Case #14-cv-1961) are OVERRULED. (Zignago, K.)
May 18, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/18/16 ORDERING that this action is related to case 2:16-CV-01028 JAM-EFB.(Becknal, R)
May 5, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/4/16 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The parties shall file a single joint status report no later than 5/18/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
February 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/5/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 02/05/16 ORDERING that case 2:16-cv-0174 is RELATED to the following cases: 2:14-cv-01961, 2:14-cv-01960, 2:14-cv-01957, 2:14-cv-01946, 2:14-cv-01965, No. 2:13-CV-02439, No. 2:14-cv-01963, No. 2:15-CV-00429, No. 2:15-CV-00623, No. 2:15-CV-00622, 2:15-CV-02150, No. 1:15-cv-01721, No. 2:15-cv-02396, 1:1 5-cv-01748, 2:15-cv-02597, 1:15-cv-01872, 1:15-cv-01874, 2:15-cv-02594. (Benson, A)
February 4, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/3/16 Related Case(s) with 2:13cv2439 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1946 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1957 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1960 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1961 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1963 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1965 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1721 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1748 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1872 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1874 JAM EFB, 2:15cv429 JAM EFB, 2:15cv622 JAM EFB, 2:15cv623 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2150 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2396 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2594 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2597 JAM EFB, REASSIGNING CASE 2:16cv211 JAM KJN to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:16-CV-211 JAM EFB.(Reader, L)
January 25, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/19/2016 FINDING that the case denominated 2:14-cv-01946 JAM EFB is related to the actions denominated 1:15-cv-01872 JAM JLT, 2:15-cv-02594 JAM AC and 2:15-cv-02597 JAM CMK within the mea ning of Local Rule 123; ORDERING that the magistrate judge assignment in said related cases be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings; ORDERING that the caption on all documents filed henceforth in the reassigned cases be shown as 1:15-cv-01872 JAM EFB, 2:15-cv-02594 JAM EFB and 2:15-cv-02597 JAM EFB, respectively. (Michel, G.)
January 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/19/2016 FINDING that the case denominated 2:14-cv-01946 JAM EFB is related to the actions denominated 2:15-cv-02396 JAM CMK and 1:15-cv-01874 JAM SAB within the meaning of Local Rule 123 ; ORDERING that the magistrate judge assignment in said related cases be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings; ORDERING that the caption on all documents filed henceforth in the reassigned cases be shown as 2:15-cv-02396 JAM EFB and 1:15-cv-01874 JAM EFB, respectively. (Michel, G.)
December 29, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/29/2015 FINDING that this case is related to the action denominated 1:15-cv-01748 WBS SKO within the meaning of Local Rule 123; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G.)
November 17, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/16/15 ORDERING that the action denominated 1:15-CV-01721 LJO-MJS be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings, and any dates cur rently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 1:15-CV-01721 JAM-EFB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 21, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/20/2015 RELATED CASE(S) with 2:15CV2150 MCE DAD, 2:13CV2439 JAM EFB, 2:14-CV-01946 JAM-EFB, 2:14CV1957 JAM-EFB, 2:14CV1961 JAM-EFB, 2:14CV1963 JAM-EFB, 2:14CV1965 JAM-EFB, 2:15CV429 JAM-EFB, 2:1 5CV622 JAM-EFB, 2:15CV623 JAM-EFB REASSIGNING CASE 2:15CV2150 to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:15CV2150 JAM EFB. (Reader, L)
April 21, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/20/2015 ORDERING 21 that the Motion to Stay by Rite Aid Corporation is WITHDRAWN 14 ; the parties deadlines to file their joint status report is SET for 5/18/2015, to coincide with the deadline to file joint status reports in the other actions related to this action by the Court's prior orders.(Reader, L)
April 1, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE 4 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/31/2015. The actions denominated 2:15-CV-0622 TLN CMK and 2:15-CV-0523 MCE EFB shall be REASSIGNED to Judge and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in cases shall be shown as 2:15-CV-0622 JAM EFB and 2:15-CV-0623 JAM EFB. Clerk to make appropriate adjustments to reassigned cases. (Marciel, M)
March 31, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/30/15 re: 16 ORDERING that the 4/8/15 hearing on 14 Motion to Stay be CONTINUED from 4/8/15 to 4/22/15. Motion Hearing RESET for 4/22/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Meuleman, A)
November 6, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/5/14, ORDERING that the 11/19/2014 hearing on defendant Rite Aid Corporation's motion to stay is VACATED. All proceedings in this action are hereby STAYED until 1/27/2015. The parties shall file an updated joint status report within 21 days after expiration of the stay imposed by this Order. (Kastilahn, A)
September 2, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/29/14 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:14-CV-01946 TLN-EFB, 2:14-CV-01957 MCE-DAD, 2:14-CV-01960 WBS-AC, 2:14-CV-01961 JAM-KJN, 2:14-CV-01963 KJM-AC, and 2:14-CV-01965 TLN-CKD be reassigne d to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be sho wn as 2:14-CV-01946 JAM-EFB, 2:14-CV-01957 JAM-EFB, 2:14-CV-01960 JAM EFB, 2:14-CV-01961 JAM-EFB, 2:14-CV-01963 JAM-EFB, and 2:14-CV- 01965 JAM-EFB. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaeger v. Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Jaeger
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Peter A. Cooper
Represented By: Rishi Nand Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?