Garrett v. Grounds
Petitioner: Hollie Garrett
Respondent: R. Grounds
Case Number: 2:2014cv01973
Filed: August 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/3/2017 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/30/17 ordering within 30 days of the date of this order, respondent shall file a response to the motion to amend. Within 20 days of service of respondent's response, petitioner may file a reply. (Plummer, M)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/26/17 ORDERING that the action denominated as 2:14-cv-1985 is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as No. 2:14-cv-1985 DB. The Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/15/2017 ORDERING Clerk of Court to file the Petition from 2:17-cv-0930 EFB as a Motion to Amend in this case, a copy of this order in this case, and close case 2:17-cv-0930 EFB. Petitioner to file all future pleadings with case number 2:14-cv-1973 JAM DB. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/22/16 ordering petitioner's request for an extension of time 42 is granted. Petitioner shall file a traverse within 60 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/22/16 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 4/22/16 34 are ADOPTED in full; and Petitioner's MOTION for a stay and abeyance (ECF No. 17 ) is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/21/16 ORDERING petitioner's motions for an extension of time to file a traverse 21 , 24 , 25 , 27 , 29 , 30 , and 33 are granted. Within 60 days o f the date of service of this order, petitioner shall file a traverse. Petitioner's request for a ruling on his motions for an extension of time 31 is granted. The clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a United States District Ju dge to this action. U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that petitioner's motion for a stay and abeyance 17 be denied. MOTION to STAY 17 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/08/15. (Plummer, M)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the Sacramento Division signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/25/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hollie Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Grounds
Represented By: Peter William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?