Hampton v. Haynie et al
Plaintiff: James Hampton
Defendant: R Haynie, D. Sherburn, Dragash, C Burnett and R. Compton
Case Number: 2:2014cv02038
Filed: September 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/15/16 recommending that defendants' motion for summary judgment 29 be granted, and this action be dismissed without prejudice. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 29 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/04/15 ordering plaintiff's surreply 35 is stricken from the court. Plaintiff's motion to bring perjury charges 36 is denied. On or before 1/04/16, plaintiff shall either, 1)re-s ubmit his prior opposition bearing his signature, or 2) file a signed amended opposition that includes all of his arguments and evidence in opposition to the motion. If plaintiff files an "Amended Opposition," defendants shall file an amended reply within 7 days, No other briefing is permitted. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a copy of his opposition with the filing banner removed 33 .. (Plummer, M)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/16/15. Discovery in this action is stayed pending resolution of defendants motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/12/15 DENYING 25 Motion. (Dillon, M)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 19 motion, without prejudice. (Yin, K)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/3/2015 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 15 motion. (Yin, K)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/14/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of James Hampton and forward payment to the court until the balance i s paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Haynie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sherburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?