Mehmood v. U.S. Marshals Service et al
Plaintiff: Yasir Mehmood
Defendant: U.S. Marshals Service, Sacramento County Main Jail Superintendent, Terry Toliver, Director of Food Services and Andris
Case Number: 2:2014cv02075
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/17/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 47 motion for reconsideration. (Yin, K)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/7/16 DENYING 44 Motion for emergency relief. (Dillon, M)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/30/15 denying 39 Motion for Extension of time and denying 40 Motion for injunctive relief. This action is dismissed without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/21/15 ordering the second amended complaint 32 is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a third amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/14/2015 DENYING, as moot, plaintiff's 25 motion for an extension ; and DENYING plaintiff's 26 motion for emergency injunctive relief. Plaintiff may only file the following doc uments: a. One second amended complaint; b. One dispositive motion, limited to one memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion and one reply to any opposition; c. One opposition to any motion filed by defendants (and clearly ti tled as such); d. Only one non-dispositive motion pending at any time, limited to one memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion and one reply to any opposition; and e. One set of objections to any future findings and recommendations. (Yin, K)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/27/15 ordering the 02/25/15 order directing plaintiff to submit service documents for Andris and Toliver 9 is hereby vacated. Plaintiff's motions concerning the submission of service documents 17 and 18 are denied as moot. (Plummer, M)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/12/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion to amend relief 10 is denied; Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel 11 is denied; and within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint. (Dillon, M)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Yasir Mehmood signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/1/2014. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forw ard to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacrmento County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehmood v. U.S. Marshals Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasir Mehmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marshals Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Main Jail Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Food Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?