Cesca Therapeutics, Inc. v. SynGen, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Cesca Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: SynGen, Inc., PHC Medical, Inc., Philip Coelho, Terrence Wolf and Prince Emmanuel
Case Number: 2:2014cv02085
Filed: September 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/13/2017 GRANTING 153 Motion to Dismiss. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety as to all parties, including Defendants who were previously dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2); Each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees; The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/6/2017 ORDERING Cesca Therapeutics, Inc., shall have an additional 21 days, until and including 4/26/2017, to comply with Paragraph 1(e) of the Court's 3/6/2017 Order 141 , in accordance with the terms set forth in this Order.(Reader, L)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/28/17 ORDERING that Defendants' 74 motion to stay proceedings pending appeal is DENIED. If this case litigates until the point of final pretrial preparations and the Ninth Circuit has yet to issue a ruling, then Defendants may renew their motion for a stay. (Kastilahn, A)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/6/17, GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART Defendant's 122 Motion to Compel. (Kastilahn, A)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/9/2017 GRANTING 106 Motion to Compel. (Washington, S)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/16 ORDERING that the Joint Request to Seal is GRANTED. The following documents shall be filed under seal: Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Request for Reconsideration of M agistrate Judges Ruling; Exhibit A to the Declaration of Ali S. Razai, filed in support of the Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants' Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate Judges Ruling (Cesca's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories). (Kastilahn, A)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/23/2016 ORDERING that the Defendants' deadline to produce documents responsive to Plaintiff's Request for Production No. 27 in accordance with the Court's Order shall be EXTENDED to 12/15/2016, and Plaintiff's deadline to supplement its responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 2 and 7 in accordance with the Court's Order shall be EXTENDED to 12/19/2016. (Jackson, T)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/20/16 ORDERING that the Defendants' motion to compel (ECF No. 81 ) is GRANTED in part; Plaintiff's motion to compel (ECF No. 82 ) is GRANTED in part; The parties' joint request to seal certain documents pursuant to Local Rule 141 (ECF No. 84 ) is GRANTED in part. (Becknal, R)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/9/2016 GRANTING 5-page extension for defendant's reply brief. Defendant's reply in support of their motion to stay shall not exceed 15 pages. (Zignago, K.)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/5/2016 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 3/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. The pending 49 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal is deemed WITHDRAWN. (Zignago, K.)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/24/2015. (Zignago, K.)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/14/2015 DENYING 50 Motion to Shorten Time. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the 10/26/2015 hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay is VACATED. (Donati, J)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/07/15 ORDERING that the 41 Motion to Compel Arbitration is DENIED. (Benson, A)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/8/2015 ORDERING the Pretrial Scheduling Conference is continued to 10/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint Status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. (Becknal, R)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/29/15 re: 36 ORDERING Status Conference RESCHEDULED TO 8/3/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the hearing. (Meuleman, A)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/25/15: The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference scheduled for hearing on April 20, 2015, is continued to June 22, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference. MOTION to compel arbitration 31 is deemed withdrawn; therefore, the April 13, 2015 hearing on that motion is vacated. (Kaminski, H)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 1/29/15 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until and including 3/2/2015 to answer or otherwise respond to Cesca's Complaint. The Status Conference is RESET for 4/20/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. The deadline for the parties to hold a Rule 26(f) conference shall be 3/23/2015. A joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the scheduling conference. The deadline for the parties to exchange initial disclosures shall be 4/6/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/31/2014 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until and including 1/30/2015 to answer or otherwise respond to Cesca's Complaint. The status conference shall be RESCHEDULED for 3 /10/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. The deadline for the parties to hold a Rule 26(f) conference shall be 2/13/2015. The deadline for the parties to file a Joint Status Report shall be 2/20/2015. The deadline for the parties to exchange initial disclosures shall be 2/27/2015. (Zignago, K.)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 12/9/14 ORDERING that defendants have until and including 12/31/14 to answer or otherwise respond to Cesca's Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/26/14 re: 18 ORDERING Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 1/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the hearing. (Meuleman, A)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on November 13, 2014 re 16 . Defendants shall have until and including December 10, 2014 to answer or otherwise respond to Cescas Complaint.(Rivas, A)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/22/2014 ORDERING the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the 2 Complaint by 11/19/2014. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cesca Therapeutics, Inc. v. SynGen, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SynGen, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHC Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Coelho
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Wolf
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince Emmanuel
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesca Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?