Carr v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Carr
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons, Leonardo Giron, James H. Olson, Mike Babcock and Jesus Bernabe
Case Number: 2:2014cv02110
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/05/2020 GRANTING 108 Stipulated Request to Dismiss. CASE CLOSED. (Tupolo, A)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/30/2020 VACATING all current deadlines in this action. On or before 5/26/2020, the parties shall file documents to dispose of this action or a joint status report explaining the status of the settlement. (Yin, K)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/13/2020 ORDERING that plaintiff will submit to a medical examination by Dr. Darin J. Davidson, M.D., on 2/26/2020, at 11:30 a.m. at 1600 116th Avenue, NE, Suite 202, Bellevue, W ashington 98004. No staff or attorneys from the offices of plaintiff or defendant will attend the examinations. The examination will not exceed 2.5 hours. The examination will not include any testing or procedure that is painful, protracted or intru sive. Defendant shall be responsible for the costs and fees associated with the examination. Defendant will provide Plaintiff a copy of the examiner's report setting out the history, examinations, findings, including the results of all tests made, diagnosis, prognoses, and conclusions of the examiner, Dr. Davidson, M.D., without a request needed and within five (5) court days of Defendant's receipt of the same. (Zignago, K.)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/12/19 ORDERING the scheduling order is modified as follows: Non-expert discovery closes: March 13, 2020. Plaintiffs deadline to disclose experts: April 24, 2020. Defendants deadline to disclo se experts: May 22, 2020. Deadline to disclose rebuttal experts: June 12, 2020. Expert discovery closes: July 24, 2020.Law and motion filing deadline: September 9, 2020. Law and motion cutoff: October 7, 2020. The remaining provisions of the Courts scheduling order 98 remain in effect.(Plummer, M)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/23/19 APPROVING 100 the Joint Stipulation to modify the scheduling order. The scheduling order is modified as follows: Non-expert discovery closes: January 31, 2020Plaintiffs deadline to d isclose experts: March 13, 2020. Defendants deadline to disclose experts: April 10, 2020. Deadline to disclose rebuttal experts: May 1, 2020. Expert discovery closes: June 12, 2020. Law and motion filing deadline: July 24, 2020. Law and motion cutoff: August 21, 2020. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/27/19 ORDERING plaintiff shall have until April 15, 2019, to file an amended complaint or motion to amend. An amended complaint must be limited to clarifying plaintiffs surviving Federal Tort Claims Act claim. If plaintiff seeks to amend the complaint beyond that scope, he must file a motion to amend that is accompanied by the proposed amended complaint. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by April 1, 2019. (Plummer, M)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/25/19 ORDERING on or before 2/27/19, the parties shall submit their joint status report addressing the items set forth in the court's order of 12/28/18 92 . (Plummer, M)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/28/18 VACATING 12/27/18 91 Discovery and Scheduling Order; within 30 days, the parties shall confer and submit a joint status report and proposed scheduling order that briefly sets out their views on the matters outlined in the order. (Benson, A.)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/11/2018 ORDERING within 21 days, defendant United States of America shall answer the complaint; the Clerk shall update the docket to reflect that plaintiff's address is 220 11th Ave., Seattle, WA 98122. (Yin, K)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/16/2017 RECOMMENDING defendants' 55 motion to dismiss be GRANTED; defendants Olson, Babcock, and Bernabe be dismissed with prejudice; and the Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/10/2016 ORDERING 52 that upon reconsideration, the Order 48 of the magistrate judge is AFFIRMED. (Reader, L)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/27/16 ordering the clerk of court is directed to prepare 3 summons and copies of the complaint filed 1/26/15 and submit these documents to the United States Marshal for service on defendant Un ited States of America. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. Service of process shall be completed by delivering a copy of the summons and complaint to the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of California, and by sending a copy of the summons and complaint by registered or certified mail to the Attorney General of the United States at Washington D.C.. The Marshall shall also send a copy o f the summons and complaint by registered or certified mail to the Warden, FCI-Herlong at 741-925 Access Road, A-25, Herlong, CA 96113. Plaintiff's motion for hearing 46 is denied as moot per the 4/11/16 order and the instant order. (Plummer, M)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/8/2016 ORDERING Plaintiff's 42 request for reconsideration of the 3/23/2015 ruling is GRANTED; the 3/23/2015 order 19 is VACATED; the magistrate judge is directed to RE-SCREEN the amended complaint 16 ; and Defendant Giron's 35 motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. (Reader, L)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/5/2015 GRANTING plaintiff an extension of 21 days, up to and including 10/16/2015, to file an opposition to defendant's pending motion to dismiss. Defendant may file a reply, if any, within 7 days from the date on which the opposition is entered into the Court's ECF system. (Yin, K)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/20/2015 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 are ADOPTED in FULL; and all defendants except Giron are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. (Reader, L)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/23/15 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms within 14 days. Service is appropriate for Leonardo Giron. Clerk to send plaintiff: instruction sheet, 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form, and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint filed on 1/26/15. It is RECOMMENDED that all defendants except Giron be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/8/2015 ORDERING that plaintiff's claims against all defendants except Leonardo Giron are DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days, plaintiff is not required to file an amended complaint; and upon the filing of an amended complaint or expiration of the time allowed therefor, the court will make further orders for service of process upon some or all of the defendants.(Yin, K)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Leroy Carr signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/2014. FCI Warden shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the FCI Warden. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo Giron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Bernabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?