June 20, 2019 |
Filing
151
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/19/2019 ADOPTING 141 Findings and Recommendations in full. (York, M)
|
November 22, 2017 |
Filing
141
FINDINGS OF FACT signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/22/2017 ORDERING these findings of fact are submitted to the United States District Judge assigned to the case, pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B). Within fourt een days after being served with these findings, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings of Fact." (Becknal, R)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing
136
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/22/17 ORDERING that that the filing and service deadline for the Post-Trial Briefs is EXTENDED to 09/25/17.(Benson, A.)
|
August 7, 2017 |
Filing
125
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/7/2017 ORDERING the parties to respond by 8/14/2017 to 124 Motion to Quash. The parties shall include in their briefs a statement regarding the ability to proceed with the Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/22/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Donati, J) (Main Document 125 replaced on 8/7/2017) (Donati, J).
|
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
111
AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/11/2017 ORDERING Defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED in PART and GRANTED in PART; this order resolves ECF No. 65 and SUPERSEDES the order filed at ECF No. 95 .(Reader, L)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
110
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/10/2017 ORDERING defendants' 97 motion for reconsideration is GRANTED to the extent thecourt will correct a factual finding in its order on summary judgment; Defendants' motion is otherwise DENIED; Plaintiff's 100 motion for reconsideration is DENIED; the bench trial on federal enclave status will take place on 3/17/2017, with a joint statement due by 3/3/2017. (Reader, L)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing
95
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/30/2016 GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G.)
|
June 29, 2016 |
Filing
88
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/28/16 ORDERING that the filing and service deadline for the Joint Pre-Trial Conference Statement is CONTINUED to 7/15/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 7/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kastilahn, A)
|
April 26, 2016 |
Filing
78
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/24/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 71 request that this court extend the time for Plaintiff to file an opposition to defendants' motion to summary judgment currently due 4/22/2016 t o 5/6/2016 is GRANTED. Accordingly, defendants' 65 Motion for Summary Judgment previously set for 5/6/2016 is RESET for 5/20/2016. Plaintiff's request that this Court extend the deadline for Plaintiff to conduct the deposition of Defendant PRIDE Industries FRCP 30(b)(6) from 4/15/2016 to 4/29/2016 is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 15, 2016 |
Filing
75
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/15/2016. (Michel, G.)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
64
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/8/16. (Kaminski, H)
|
March 8, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/8/2016 ORDERING Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order (ECF No. 47 , as renewed by ECF No. 58 ), is DENIED, without prejudice to its renewal in proper form. The 3/9/2016 hearing on this matter is VACATED.(Reader, L)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
53
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/29/16 ORDERING that defendant's 47 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice; the 02/03/16 hearing is VACATED. (Benson, A)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/30/2015 GRANTING 22 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time; ORDERING that jurisdictional discovery be completed by 5/30/2015; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit an amended complaint by 6/15/2015. (Michel, G.)
|
March 6, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/5/15 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's request for jurisdictional discovery is GRANTED as set forth. Jurisdictional discovery shall be completed by 5/1/15. "Compl eted" means not only that discovery itself is concluded, but that any discovery disputes are fully resolved. Plaintiff may seek leave to amend his complaint following the completion of jurisdictional discovery, with any motion seeking leave filed by 5/15/15. (Meuleman, A)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/14 ORDERING that within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this Order, plaintiff shall file a response to Pride's pending motion, or plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be dismissed with leave to amend. (Becknal, R)
|