November 23, 2016 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/23/16 ORDERING that Renee N. Parras is appointed as co-counsel in the above entitled matter; Appointed co-counsel shall notify Sujean Park at (916) 930-4278, or via email at spark@caed.uscourts.gov if she has any questions related to the appointment; the Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Renee N. Parras, Tower Legal Group, 1510 J St., Suite 125, Sacramento, CA 95814. (cc: R. Parras) (Becknal, R)
|
October 13, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/12/16 ORDERING that plaintiffs' 58 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED; Attorney Michael Erik Vinding is APPOINTED for the limited purpose of assisting plaintiffs with preparing for and participating in a settlement conference; the appointment will terminate 15 days after completion of the settlement conference, or any continuation of the settlement conference. (Benson, A)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing
45
ORDER adopting 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/27/16: MOTION for summary judgment (ECF No. 34) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. CROSS-MOTION for summary judgment (ECF No. 38) is DENIED. (Kaminski, H)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing
40
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/16 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 34 be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment 38 b e DENIED. Summary judgment be granted in favor of the City of Vallejo as to plaintiffs' Monell claim. Summary judgment be denied as to Marvin's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claim against Officer McCarthy and Pamala's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claim against Officer Bautista. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/20/16 ORDERING that the MOTION to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order 32 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/15/2016 ORDERING 30 that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is DENIED. (Reader, L)
|
January 4, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/4/16 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion to compel 27 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the January 14, 2016 hearing is VACATED. (Becknal, R)
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/15/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 21 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's 6/8/2015 20 Order requiring monetary sanctions is VACATED. (Marciel, M)
|
June 8, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/8/15: Within 21 days of this order, plaintiffs shall pay to the Clerk of Court a total of $100.00 in monetary sanctions based on their failure to comply with the courts April 2, 2015 order. Within 21 days of this order, the parties shall meet and confer, prepare, and file an updated joint status report regarding scheduling of the case. (Kaminski, H)
|
May 28, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/28/15 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 17 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
|
April 2, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/2/2015 GRANTING the plaintiffs until 6/1/2015 to obtain an attorney; ORDERING any attorney retained before 6/1/2015 to file a Notice of Appearance on behalf of the plaintiffs by 6/1/2015; ORDERI NG the plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer and to file an updated joint status report with proposed case scheduling dates by 6/1/2015; STAYING any formal discovery and motion practice until a scheduling order or other appropriate order issues. (Michel, G.)
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/2015 GRANTING the plaintiffs until 4/1/2015 to obtain an attorney; ORDERING said retained attorney to file a Notice of Appearance by 4/1/2015; ALTERNATIVELY ORDERING the plaintiffs to meet and confer with the defendants' counsel and to file a joint statement by 4/1/2015, addressing the topics noted herein; STAYING any formal discovery and motion practice until a scheduling order or other appropriate order issues. (Michel, G.)
|
October 14, 2014 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/14/2014 GRANTING plaintiffs' 2 3 Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Service is appropriate for all defendants. Clerk directed to issue all process and send plaintiffs the following: 3 USM-285 forms, an instruction sheet, 1 Summons, Judge Newman's Scheduling Order/Consent forms. Within 30 days from date Order is filed, plaintiffs shall supply U.S. Marshal with all information/documents needed to effectuate served of process. Clerk directed to serve copy of Order on U.S. Marshal. Plaintiffs failure to comply with Order may result in appropriate sanctions. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services](Marciel, M)
|