Stiles v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Sharidan Stiles
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and American International Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02234
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/10/2020 SETTING Motion Hearing on 193 Motion for Reconsideration, 457 Motion for Summary Judgment, 473 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and 501 Request to Seal Document for 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Parties will brief the motions for summary judgment according to the briefing schedule set out in their 511 -3 Joint Response. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 2/8/2021. Defendant's Reply due by 2/26/2021. The renewed request to seal will be briefed in7 accordance with Local Rule 230 (c) &(d). This Order resolves 506 Motion. (Coll, A)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/17/2020 DISCHARGING 498 Order to Show Cause. (Zignago, K.)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/17/2020 VACATING the hearing set for 11/18/2020 on Defendant's request to seal documents and the hearing set for 12/9/2020 on plaintiff's motion for a briefing schedule. (Kastilahn, A)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/23/2020 ORDERING that: Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE in writing within 30 days of the date of this order why unrepresented corporate plaintiff Stiles 4 U, Inc., should not be dismissed; and STRIKING Plaintiffs' improper and deficient pro se filings, ECF Nos. 493 and 497 . (Becknal, R)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/13/2020 GRANTING the application filed by Pierce, Bainbridge, Beck, Price & Hecht LLP, ECF No. 453 ; GRANTING the applications filed by the Dhillon Law Group, ECF Nos. 451 & 452 ; DENYING the application by the Dhillon Law Group for in camera review, ECF No. 469 ; STAYING these matters until 9/18/2020; GRANTING Counsels' withdrawal effective 9/18/2020, or upon the filing of a substitution of counsel by plaintiffs; Status Conf erence is set in Redding, CA, on 8/19/2020, at 10:00 a.m., all counsel to appear telephonically and with plaintiffs' counsel arranging for Ms. Stiles' telephonic participation and The Court authorizes Ms. Stiles to file a pro se request for a copy of the transcript of the 6/23/2020, hearing and any such hearings through 9/18/2020, including but not limited to the status conference set for 8/19/2020. (Becknal, R)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/15/2020 DENYING 474 Request to Seal Document(s) without prejudice to a renewed motion containing a more developed explanation of defendant's need for sealing. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment may remain on the public docket as is, with placeholder exhibits attached. 473 .(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/5/2020 SETTING for Hearing the pending 453 and 469 Applications on 6/16/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Redding (DMC), before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. All counsel SHALL APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY through CourtCall. Counsel for Sharidan Stiles and Stiles 4 U, Inc., SHALL ARRANGE for Ms. Stiles' appearance TELEPHONICALLY though CourtCall. (York, M)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/26/2020 DENYING 430 Motion to Strike. (Zignago, K.)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/11/2020 TAKING the 430 Motion to Strike Hearing off calendar with the matter to be submitted on the record without oral argument. (Coll, A)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/22/2020 AUTHORIZING the parties to appear telephonically through CourtCall at the 5/13/2020 hearing re 430 Motion to Strike. (Zignago, K.)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/17/2020 ORDERING the deadline to complete the depositions of Jeanne Helfrich, Robin Foshee, Procter & Gamble, and Onyx Corp. is EXTENDED up to and including 5/22/2020. The deadline to disclose expert rebuttal reports is EXTENDED up to and including 5/29/2020. Fact discovery otherwise remains closed, and all other dates and deadlines remain unchanged. (Zignago, K.)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/10/2020 REASSIGNING case no. 2:19-CV-2145-TLN-AC from Judge Troy L. Nunley to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Allison Claire to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:19-CV-2145-KJM-DMC. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/24/2020 EXTENDING the deadline to complete the depositions of Jeanne Helfrich, Robin Foshee, Procter & Gamble, and Onyx Corp. to 5/1/2020 and EXTENDING the Expert Rebuttal deadline to 5/9/2020. Fact discovery otherwise remains closed, and all other dates and deadlines remain unchanged. (Coll, A)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/23/2020 ORDERING that pursuant to General Order 612, the hearing set for 4/15/2020, before the undersigned, on plaintiffs' 421 motion for leave to file sur-replies is VACATED and plaintiffs' motion is SUBMITTED on the papers. Opposition to plaintiffs' motion is due by 4/1/2020 and plaintiffs' reply is due by 4/8/2020. The Court will address plaintiffs' motion upon completion of briefing. (Kastilahn, A)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/12/2020 ORDERING that this case be related to case number 2:19-cv-2146-KJM-DB and that the related case be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustments in the case assignment. (Huang, H)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/5/2020 re 370 Motion to Quash, 377 Motion to Compel, and 381 Motion to Enforce. (Coll, A)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/5/2020 GRANTING 362 Motion for leave to file a sur-reply. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file plaintiffs' sur-reply, attached to its motion Exhibit A, ECF 329 -1, as of 2/6/2020. (Reader, L)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/3/20 GRANTING 398 Request to Appear Telephonically. (Kaminski, H)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 02/14/20 DENYING 382 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time; SETTING Hearing on 370 Motion to Quash, 381 Motion to Enforce and 377 Motion to Compel (already set) for 3/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The parties and affected non-parties shall meet and confer regarding the discovery disputes and shall file a single joint statement by 5:00 p.m. PST on 02/26/20. Telephonic appearances are not permitted unless the court approves a written request for telephonic appearance showing good cause why a personal appearance should be excused. (Benson, A.)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RECUSAL ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/2020 ORDERING that District Judge Troy L. Nunley recuses himself. All pending dates before Judge Nunley are VACATED, and to be reset by the judge that is reassigned. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 2:14-cv-02234-JAM-DMC. (Zignago, K.)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/7/2020 STRIKING 357 Motion to Compel without prejudice as improperly noticed; ORDERING 362 Motion to Strike is submitted without oral argument; GRANTING Walmart until 2/21/2020 to file an Opposition to 362 Motion to Strike with plaintiff's Reply due by 2/28/2020; and VACATING the 2/12/2020 and 3/5/2020 hearings in Redding. (Coll, A)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/5/2020 DENYING 324 Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 332 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING 334 Motion to Compel and DENYING 336 Motion for Protective Order as t o Topic 7 to the extent plaintiffs seek testimony concerning the mechanics of Walmart's information sharing as well as to Topics 4, 5, 6, and 29. Pursuant to plaintiffs' counsel's representations, the scope of Walmart's Rule 30(b)(6) witness deposition as to Topics 4, 5, and 6 is limited to the beauty category for the time period January 1, 2009, to October 1, 2014, and the wet shave category for the time period January 1, 2007, to October 1, 2014. (Coll, A)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/31/2020 GRANTING stipulated request to shorten time. Plaintiffs' 334 motion to compel Rule 30(b)(6) testimony and Walmart's 336 motion for a protective order are set f or hearing in Redding, California, on 2/5/2020, at 10:00 a.m. Personal appearances of counsel are required. The parties shall file a SINGLE Joint Statement regarding these motions on or before 5:00 p.m. on 2/3/2020. Upon the filing of the Joint Statement, the court will determine whether the matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. (Zignago, K.)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/28/2020 ORDERING the 1/29/2020 hearing re 324 Motion to Compel is taken off calendar and the matter is submitted on the record and briefs without oral argument. (Zignago, K.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/27/20 GRANTING 327 Request for Telephonic Appearance. (Kaminski, H)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/17/20 DENYING 279 Motion to Compel, GRANTING IN PART 280 Motion to Compel, GRANTING IN PART 281 Motion to Compel, GRANTING 288 Motion for leave to take depositions in excess of ten and DENYING 308 Motion to Compel. (Kaminski, H)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/18/19 ORDERING that on or before 12/20/2019, plaintiff shall re-draft the disputed requests for production and serve re-drafted requests for production on defendant Walmart. Defendant Walmart shall have 25 days from the date of service of re-drafted requests for production to serve responses and responsive documents. (Kastilahn, A)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/12/2019 DENYING 290 Ex Parte Application and SETTING 288 Motion to Compel Hearing for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The parties shall meet an d confer regarding the discovery dispute and file a joint statement on or before 1/8/2020. Telephonic appearances are not allowed unless the court approves a written request for telephonic appearance showing good cause for excusing a personal appearance. (Huang, H)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/9/2019 WITHDRAWING and STRIKING and VACATING the hearing on 270 Motion to Compel as it pertains to Walmart's redactions applied to documents (the 3rd bullet point in Plaintiff's notic e of motion); CONTINUING to 1/15/2020 the hearing on 280 and 281 Motions to Compel and 279 Motion to Compel, as it pertains to Walmart's responses to Plaintiffs' interrogatories (the 5th and 6th bullet points in Plaintiff's notice of motion); and ORDERING the hearing on 279 Motion to Compel, as it pertains to the issues detailed in this order, remains set for 12/11/2019. (Henshaw, R)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/19/2019 DENYING without prejudice 232 Motion for Leave to Add Defendants and DENYING as MOOT 262 Request to File a Sur-Reply. (Huang, H)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/8/19 REASSIGNING 2:19-cv-1218-WBS-EFB to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. Senior Judge William B. Shubb, Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan no longer assigned to case. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. (Coll, A)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/10/19 GRANTING Request to Seal; the following documents may be filed under seal: 1. Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Jeremy Ostrander in support of Defendants' Opposition to Pl aintiffs' Motion Seeking Leave to Join Additional Defendants. Additionally, parts of the Opposition which reference, cite, or quote the sealed exhibits or exhibits previously sealed by this Court (ECF No. 258) and the confidential portions of the Declaration of Esther Gifford can be redacted. (Benson, A.)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 AMENDED SEALING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/6/19 AMENDING Order (ECF No. 242 ) as follows: Exhibits 1-5, 25, 29, and 37 to Plaintiffs' Motion Seeking Leave to Join Additional Defendants (ECF No. 232 ) are UNSEALED and shall be filed publicly on the docket. Plaintiffs' pending Motions for Reconsideration (ECF No. 243 246 are DENIED as moot. (Becknal, R)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/17/19 GRANTING 234 Request to Seal Document(s). (Kaminski, H)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/17/2019 EXTENDING all operative deadlines in the case schedule six months. The Parties' request for a case management conference on 6/13/2019 is DENIED without prejudice as moot. (Zignago, K.)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/6/19 DROPPING 201 Amended Motion to Compel from the court's calendar without prejudice and VACATING the hearing scheduled for 6/12/19. (Coll, A)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/13/2019 CONTINUING the hearing date on Defendants' 193 Motion for Reconsideration to 6/13/2019. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/30/19 EXTENDING Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration to 5/10/19; Defendants' deadline for filing any Reply in support of the Motion is 5/23/19; The hearing date on Defendants' Motion is continued to 6/6/19, at 2:00 p.m., unless otherwise modified by this Court. (Becknal, R)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/28/19 DENYING Defendants' 147 Motion to Dismiss the First and Second Claims of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint. (Becknal, R)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION and ORDER re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/30/19. (Coll, A)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/3/2019 DROPPING 176 Motion to Compel from the court's calendar without prejudice and VACATING the hearing scheduled for 1/9/2019. (Henshaw, R)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/11/18 CONTINUING the 176 Motion to Compel Hearing to 1/9/19 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota and EXTENDING the deadline for filing any Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disagreement or Affidavit to 1/2/19. (Coll, A)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/3/2018. (Huang, H)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/28/18 ORDERING that within five days of the date of this order, plaintiffs shall submit a stipulated proposed protective order, with signatures of all counsel approving as to form and content, or defendants shall file a notice indicating their assent to terms of the proposed protective order submitted by plaintiffs on November 27, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/19/18 GRANTING 165 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff shall submit a stipulated proposed protective order absent an AEO provision no later than 11/27/18. Defendants shall serve responses to all outstanding discovery including requested documents by 12/7/18. The subject discovery responses by Defendants shall be without objection. (Coll, A)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/06/18 ORDERING that Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. shall now be known as Walmart Inc. in this action. This name change does not affect any substantive issue in this case. (Benson, A.)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/29/18 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' deadline for answering or otherwise responding to Defendants' Counterclaims 148 and 151 is EXTENDED to not later than 9/14/18; and Plaintiffs' deadline for filing an Opposition to Defendants' Motion is EXTENDED to not later than 9/14/18, and Defendants' deadline for filing any Reply Brief is EXTENDED to not later than 9/27/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/9/18. Rule 26(f) Conference deadline 7/27/18. File Discovery Plan deadline 8/10/18. Initial Disclosures deadline 8/17/18 deadline 8/17/17. Serve Initial Discovery--RFPs, ROGs, and RFAs on or after 8/17/18. Close of Fact Discovery 7/10/19. Disclosure of Experts Reports 9/9/19. Supplemental Expert Reports 10/9/19. Dispositive Motions within 150 days after the close of fact discovery. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/19/2018 EXTENDING Time to and including 8/10/2018, for Defendants to Respond to 142 Fourth Amended Complaint. (York, M)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/19/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff's 104 Motion for Reconsideration as to Counts 5 and 7 is GRANTED. Walmart's 118 Motion to Strike Counts 5, 6, and 7 of the TAC is GRANTED but its request for sanctions is DENIED. AI's 121 Motion to Dismiss Count 9 is DENIED. AI's Motion to Strike Count 8 of the TAC is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 135 Request to Set a Rule 16 Conference is DENIED. Plaintiff shall fil e an amended complaint within 20 days. Additionally, the parties are ORDERED to review the Court's May 2016 IPTSO and to meet and confer regarding a timeline for discovery not later than ten (10) days after Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint. Not later than fourteen (14) days after that deadline, the parties are ordered to submit a proposed discovery schedule by stipulation and proposed order for this Court's review and approval. (Zignago, K.)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/3/18 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' time within which to file any counterclaims against Defendants is hereby EXTENDED to not later than four business days following the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/21/17: Plaintiffs' deadline for answering or otherwise responding to Defendants' Answers and Counterclaims is extended to not later than December 1, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/29/17, ORDERING that Walmart's 64 Motion to Dismiss, joined by AI, is GRANTED, AI's 65 separate Motion to Dismiss Count 8 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 75 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action against Walmart and AI is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action against Walmart and AI is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Plaintiff's Seve nth Cause of Action against Walmart and AI is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Plaintiff's Eighth Cause of Action against AI is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Defendant will be given one opportunity to amend her complaint to allege specific w rongful conduct by AI, and a timeline supporting her allegation that AI interfered with her prospective business relationship with Walmart. Walmart's 71 Second Motion to Dismiss and AI's 72 related Joinder are STRICKEN without prejudice to refiling at an appropriate time.(Kastilahn, A)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/29/2016. The hearing date for all pending motions, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 64, 65, 71, and 72) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 75), shall be continued from December 1, 2016, to January 12, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7.(Deutsch, S)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/7/2016 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 64 , 65 , 71 Motions to Dismiss and 75 Motion to Strike to 12/1/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that all oppositions be filed by 11/9/2016; ORDERING that all replies be filed by 11/23/2016. (Michel, G.)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/18/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 76 Application for Order Shortening Time is DENIED; the 75 Motion to Strike REMAINS as noticed for 11/17/16. On its own motion, the Court CONSOL IDATES all pending 64 , 65 , 71 motions and CONTINUES those hearings to 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Plaintiff's deadline to file an Opposition to defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss is EXTENDED to 11/03/16; should plaintiff require additional time beyond 11/03/16, the Court anticipates that the parties will be able to stipulate to an additional extension. (Benson, A)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/1/16 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss is EXTENDED to on or before 9/6/2016. Defendants' dea dline for filing any Reply Briefs is EXTENDED to on or before 10/10/2016. The hearing date for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/12/16 ORDERING that Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and American International Industries' deadline for responding to Plaintiff Sharidan Stiles Second Amended Complaint shall be extended from July 8, 2016 to and including August 8, 2016. (Becknal, R)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/8/16, ORDERING that the deadline for defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and American International Industries' to respond to Plaintiff's second amended complaint is EXTENDED to 7/8/16. (Kastilahn, A)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/26/16: The deadline for filing the Second Amended Complaint is extended to May 23, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/19/16 ORDERING since this action no longer involves a pro se party, (ECF No. 52), and due to the undersigned judge's caseload consisting of primarily criminal cases and other category of cases, the Clerk of the Court shall randomly reassign this case and make the appropriate adjustments. (Becknal, R)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/18/2016 ORDERING that, because plaintiff is now represented by counsel, the matter is REFERRED back to the assigned District Judge. (Zignago, K.)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/20/16 ORDERING that the deadline for filing the Second Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to on or before 5/20/2016. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/15/16 EXTENDING the deadline to file second Amended Complaint to 4/21/2016. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting 39 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/22/16: Motion for leave to file additional briefing is granted 33 . Motion to dismiss is granted 24 . Plaintiff's first amended complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint consistent with the 9/2/15, findings and recommendations within 30 days of the date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/2/2015 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's 33 motion for leave to file additional briefing be granted. Defendants' 24 motion to dismiss be granted. Plaintiff 9;s 16 first amended complaint be dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff be directed to file a second amended complaint consistent with these findings and recommendations. Motions referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/23/15 ORDERING Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, brings this civil action. Pending before the court is plaintiff's application (Doc. 34 ) to continue the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss, currently set for June 24, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned in Redding, California. Good cause not appearing therefor, the request is denied. (Becknal, R)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/28/2015 ORDERING that the application to exceed page limit is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file points and authorities not to exceed thirty (30) pages in length. (Zignago, K.)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/14/2015 ORDERING the plaintiff to serve and file an opposition to the 24 Motion to Dismiss by 5/27/2015; ORDERING the defendants to serve and file a reply brief re 24 Motion to Dismiss by 6/10/2015; CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 24 Motion to Dismiss to 6/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Michel, G.)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/14/15 ORDERING THAT the response of Defendants to the First Amended Complaint shall be filed by 04/27/15. (Benson, A)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/16/15 CONTINUING 12 Motion to Strike and 11 Motion to Dismiss to 4/22/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. The Initial status/scheduling conference in this matter, set for 4/22/15 is VACATED pending resolution of defendants' motions. (Meuleman, A)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/3/2015 ORDERING 8 In light of the stipulated extension of time to 3/11/2015, for defendants to respond to plaintiff's complaint, the court hereby CONTINUES the initial status scheduling conference in this case to 4/22/2015 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Reader, L)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Request to file documents in this case electronically signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/28/15: Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiles v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharidan Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?