Association of American Railroads et al v. California Office of Spill Prevention and Response et al

Plaintiff: Association of American Railroads, Union Pacific Railroad Company and BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: California Office of Spill Prevention and Response, Thomas M. Cullen, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris
Case Number: 2:2014cv02354
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/17/2015 ORDERING 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the pending motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED as MOOT. 6 (Reader, L)
December 11, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/2014 GRANTING amici applicants' 24 Unopposed Application for leave to file an Amicus Brief. (Marciel, M)
November 18, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/14/14 ORDERING that defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss shall be heard on 1/15/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss before 12/5/14, and defendants shall file their reply to plaintiffs' opposition on or before 12/19/14. (Kastilahn, A)
November 4, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/3/14. The hearing for the 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is reset for 1/15/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Defendants opposition due on or before 12/5/14. (Manzer, C)
October 22, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION for Relief from page limitation requirement 5 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/21/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of American Railroads et al v. California Office of Spill Prevention and Response et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Railroads
Represented By: Louis P. Warchot, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Maureen E. Mahoney, PHV
Represented By: Timothy L. O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Jacob D. Flesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Office of Spill Prevention and Response
Represented By: Ali Ahmad Karaouni
Represented By: Nicholas Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Cullen, Jr.
Represented By: Ali Ahmad Karaouni
Represented By: Nicholas Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Ali Ahmad Karaouni
Represented By: Nicholas Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?