Jackson v. Alfaro
Petitioner: Byron Jackson
Respondent: Sandra Alfaro
Case Number: 2:2014cv02369
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/15/15 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/25/15 granting 15 Motion to Proceed IFP. Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus is dismissed with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of this order. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner the form for habeas corpus application. (Plummer, M)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/5/15 ORDERING that Petitioner shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Dillon, M)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/8/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Alfaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Byron Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sandra Alfaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?