January 12, 2016 |
Filing
110
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/16 ORDERING that Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiffs shall fully resolve the settlement amounts owed to defendants under the parties' settlement agreement through a pa yment of $250,000.00 to defendants; At the end of this 30-day period, plaintiffs shall file a status report notifying the court of whether they have timely made the full $250,000.00 payment to defendants as directed. If plaintiffs success fully make the payment as directed by this order, plaintiffs' payment obligation under the settlement agreement will be deemed fully satisfied; If plaintiffs fail to make the full $250,000.00 payment within the 30-day timeframe allotted to them, the court will issue a subsequent order finding plaintiffs in default under the settlement agreement and directing the parties to discharge their obligations under the settlement agreement in a manner to be further detailed in that order. (Becknal, R)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing
94
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/11/15 ORDERING that the above-entitled action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, all parties bearing their own attorneys' fees and costs, and the Court shall retain jurisdiction to determine any claim of violation of the Agreement pursuant to the terms of the Agreement. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
|
August 25, 2015 |
Filing
85
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/25/15 re: 84 : IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until Thursday, 8/27/15, to file dispositional documents with this Court. (Meuleman, A)
|
July 22, 2015 |
Filing
80
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/22/15 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference is CONTINUED to 8/5/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. No later than 4:00 p.m. on 07/31/15, the parties shall file a joint statement addressing all remaining issues in the case. (Benson, A)
|
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
79
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/25/2015 ORDERING that, not later than thirty (30) days after the date this Order is electronically filed, the parties are ordered to submit dispositional documents. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 4, 2015 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/3/15: 41 Motion to Quash Service is GRANTED as to Brasberger, Sr. and DENIED as to Brasberger, Jr. and ASHMB. Default is set aside as to Brasberger, Sr. 41 Motion to Set As ide Default is DENIED. 31 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue and 34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. On the Court's own motion, this matter is h ereby STAYED and REFERRED to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Division for scheduling of a Settlement Conference before a magistrate judge. The scheduling must take place not later than 30 days after this order is electronically filed with written notice of same to be filed with this Court. The assigned magistrate judge will issue a scheduling order for the Settlement Conference, and counsel are ordered to have a principal with full settlement authority present at the Settlement Conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms. The parties are ordered to file status reports with this Court not later than 7 days after the conclusion of the Settlement Conference. (cc: ADR)(Meuleman, A)
|
January 21, 2015 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/21/15 ORDERING that Defendant's Application 36 is DENIED. Defendant is advised that if he seeks to substitute counsel, he must file a Motion that complies with LR 182(d). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/23/14 ORDERING the hearing previously set on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction for January 22, 2015, is hereby VACATED and CONTINUED to February 5, 2015; and the briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction as AMENDED follows: Plaintiffs' Motion: January 8, 2015; Defendants' Opposition: January 22, 2015; Plaintiffs' Reply: January 29, 2015.(Becknal, R)
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER; denying 9 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/1/2014. (Deutsch, S)
|