April 26, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT and DISPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/26/2016 ORDERING all pending deadlines set in this matter are VACATED. It is further ORDERED that dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Yin, K)
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/4/16 ORDERING that Plaintiffs time to file his reply to Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment may be extended up to and including May 13, 2016; and (b) Defendants time to file a motion for summary judgment and/or summary adjudication may be extended by 28 days, up to and including May 13, 2016.(Dillon, M)
|
March 24, 2016 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/23/16 ordering plaintiff's 12/18/15 (Case No. 2:15-cv-0136 52 ) and 12/28/15 motions for appointment of counsel (2:13-cv-2518, 52 ) are granted. James V. Weixel Jr. is appointed as couns el in the above entitled matters for the purpose of pursuing these four related actions on plaintiff's behalf for the limited purposes of preparing and responding to discovery, preparing and responding to pretrial motions, settlement negotiation s, and other pretrial matters, including the preparation of a brief discussing whether the related actions are brought pursuant to 42 USC 1983 or Bivens v. Six Unknown Agents, 403 U.S. 388 (1971). Plaintiff's 5/26/15 motions regarding jurisdict ion (Case No. 2:14-cv-2484, 12 , 13 ) are denied without prejudice. Appointed counsel is directed to file a brief or, if necessary and appropriate motion, regarding the proper jurisdictional basis of these cases within 60 days of the date of this order. Defendants shall file a responsive brief within 21 days of the date of service of plaintiff's counsel's brief. Plaintiff's motions contesting the limitations placed on his access to the law library, persons trained in the law, and legal supplies (Case No. 2:13-cv-2518, 42 , 46 , 47 ; Case No. 2:14-cv-2484, 22 , 25 ; Case No. 2:15-cv-0136 46 , 50 ) are denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 12/21/15 motion to compel (Case No. 2:14-cv-2484 23 ) and motion for a n extension of the discovery deadline (Case No. 2:14-cv-2484 24 ) are denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 12/14/15 motion to compel (2:15-cv-0136 51 )is denied without prejudice. Appointed counsel is directed to refile these discovery moti ons, if he deems it appropriate, with the proper briefing and support within 90 days of the date of this order. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order upon James V. Weixel, Jr., Weixel Law Office, 150 Post Street, Suite 520, San Francisco, CA 94108. (Plummer, M)
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing
37
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/15/16 ORDERING that the parties request for a four week extension of time to file and serve dispositive motions is GRANTED.(Dillon, M)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
21
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/10/15 ordering that the actions denominated 2:15-cv-136 TLN CKD P and 2:15-cv-2319 CKD P, and the same hereby are reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Henceforth the captions on all documents filed in these reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:15-cv-0136 TLN EFB P or 2:15-cv-2319 TLN EFB P. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Plummer, M)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/19/2015 ORDERING that within 21 days, defendants shall file an opposition or a statement of no opposition to the motions 12 , 13 . (Yin, K)
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
6
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/15 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Jasen Lynn Dushane and forward payment to the court until the balan ce is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
|