Benson et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Thomas Benson and Marcella Benson |
Defendant: |
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Western Progressive, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and HSBC Bank USA, N.A. |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02495 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
San Joaquin |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Presiding Judge: |
Troy L. Nunley |
Nature of Suit: |
All Other Real Property |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1640 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/18/15: ORDERING that August 27, 2015 hearing on defendants' renewed motion to dismiss is VACATED. RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs' action be DISM ISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF No. 12 and 20) be DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court be directed to close this case and vacate all dates. F&R referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/19/15 ORDERING that the 2/10/15 17 Findings and Recommendations are VACATED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
17
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/9/15 ORDERING that the 2/19/15 hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss is VACATED.The 3/12/15 status (pretrial scheduling) conference is VACATED. If nece ssary, the court will reset the date of that conference. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs' action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute the action and failure to follow the Local Rules and the court's orders. Defendants' 12 motion to dismiss be DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk be directed to close this case and vacate all dates. Matter referred to District Judge Troly L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/8/2015 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 12 Motion to Dismiss to 2/19/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; ORDERING the plaintiffs to file an opposi tion or statement of non-opposition by 2/5/2015; WARNING the plaintiffs that a failure to file an opposition to the 12 Motion to Dismiss will be deemed a statement of non-opposition and consent to the granting of said motion and shall be subject to sanctions, including a recommendation that this case be involuntarily dismissed with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(b); ORDERING that any reply be filed by 2/12/2015. (Michel, G)
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/1/2014 DENYING 10 Motion for TRO. (Donati, J)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?