Dippon v. Wells Fargo & Company
Plaintiff: Michael Dippon
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv02503
Filed: October 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/8/15: Pursuant to Rule 23(e) and Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the stipulation of the parties, Michael Dippon's individual claims are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and the claims of the putative class members are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/5/15 ORDERING that Wells Fargo's response to the First Amended Complaint is DUE on 7/8/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/13/2015 ORDERING that Wells Fargo's response to the First Amended Complaint will be due on 6/8/2015. (Zignago, K.)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/6/15 ORDERING Pursuant to the stipulation of plaintiff MICHAEL DIPPON ("Plaintiff"), and Defendants WELLS FARGO & CO., and WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. d/b/a WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE (collectively "Wells Fargo") and for good cause shown, Wells Fargo's response to the First Amended Complaint will be due on May 7, 2015. (Becknal, R)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/3/15 re: 10 ORDERING Wells Fargo's response to the First Amended Complaint due on 4/7/15. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dippon v. Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dippon
Represented By: C. Brooks Cutter
Represented By: John R Parker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Michael J. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?