October 8, 2020 |
Filing
97
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/6/2020 ORDERING that Parsons Behle's motions to enforce the settlement agreement are GRANTED. All claims in the Complaint-in-Intervention (ECF No. 93 ) are DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Court enters FINAL JUDGMENT in AT&T Mobility, LLC v. Yeager et al., No. 2:13-cv-00007-KJM-DAD, GRANTING General Yeager and Victoria Yeager exclusive rights to the interpleader funds held by the court and directing that such funds be released to the Yeagers upon entry of this FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Yeager v. Parsons Behle & Latimer, LLP, et al., No. 2:14-cv-02544-KJM-DB is DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear its o wn attorneys' fees and costs. In the No. 2:13-cv-00007 action, this order resolves ECF No. 410 . The motions for electronic filing privileges and to amend the answer pending at ECF No. 391 and ECF No. 392 are DENIED as MOOT. In the No. 2:14-cv-02544 action, this order resolves ECF No. 92 . The motion to dismiss at ECF No. 71 is DENIED as MOOT. (cc: Financial Dept)(Kastilahn, A)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing
88
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/19 ORDERING that plaintiffs are to file dismissal documents by October 8, 2019, as plaintiffs affirmatively represented to the court. Failure to file by this deadline could result in a mo tion to enforce the settlement agreement, attorney's fees, or other sanctions. Plaintiffs' request for additional discovery is denied.The court takes no position regarding plaintiffs' request to appeal Mrs. Yeager's vexatious litigant designation and the anti-SLAPP order entered against plaintiffs. (Kaminski, H)
|
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/14/2019; In the parties' 66 joint statement, Mrs. Yeager requested that James Houpt, "be formally appointed in this case and be allowed to attend the settlement conference." Mr . Houpt has agreed to attend the 4/23/2019 settlement conference and the court appoints him only for the limited purpose of assisting General Yeager at that conference through Mrs. Yeager, who stands in General Yeager's shoes as of the court&# 039;s 68 order. To be clear, the court is not appointing Mr. Houpt to serve as guardian ad litem or obligating him to serve in any capacity beyond the settlement conference. Though he is not required to do so, Mr. Houpt may submit a settlement c onference statement, as outlined in the court's recent order. Mr. Houpt's limited purpose appointment does not relieve Mrs. Yeager of her obligation to submit a settlement conference statement. The court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to serve a courtesy copy of this order as well as the 68 order on Mr. Houpt. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 12, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/11/2019 GRANTING Victoria Yeager's 67 Motion for leave to file electronically. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 8, 2016 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/7/16 ORDERING Victoria Yeager, who proceeds without separate representation in this action, moves for leave to file electronically under Local Rule 183(c). ECF No. 57 . This case is currently stayed in its entirety. Order Jan. 25, 2016, at 2, ECF No. 54 . Mrs. Yeager's request is therefore DENIED without prejudice to renewal after the stay is lifted. (Becknal, R)
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/24/2015 ORDERING that the 43 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL. Plaintiff's 13 motion to remand is DENIED. This case is STAYED pending the issuance of an order in the related case, No. 13-0007, on the question of General Yeager's competency to proceed without representation. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 4, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/3/15. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 23 37 39 Motions for Permission to File Electronically are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; IT IS ALSO HEREBY RECOMMENDED that 13 MOTION to REMAND be denied; and defendants be directed to file a response to plaintiffs' complaint within 14 days of any order adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
|
July 21, 2015 |
Filing
42
ORDER denying the Yeagers' 38 Motion for Recusal, signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/21/15. (Kastilahn, A)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/8/2015 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 13 Motion to Remand to 3/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd; NOTIFYING the parties that appearance at said motion hearing may be made telephonically if appropriate arrangements are made. (Michel, G)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
7
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/4/14 ORDERING that this case is REASSIGNED from District Judge John A. Mendez to to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and from Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney to Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. The Caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:14-cv-2544 KJM DAD. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|