Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Pate et al
Plaintiff: |
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Sharon L. Pate, Norman L. Monks, Linda M. Mochell and Beulah Monks |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02558 |
Filed: |
November 2, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Presiding Judge: |
Morrison C. England |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 20, 2017 |
Filing
33
STIPULATION and ORDER FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS AND DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/20/17. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims of Norman L. Monks and Linda M. Mochell be DISMISSED and that the proceeds of the Metropolitan Life Insurance policy deposited with this Court be released to attorney R. Mark Rose on behalf of his client, Beulah Monks. Once that release has been effectuated, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/29/2016 ORDERING that MetLife's 25 Motion for Dismissal and Discharge ofAll Liability is GRANTED. Met Life is accordingly DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Although the first stage of the two-part interpleader process has now been completed, the remaining parties must now litigate their entitlement to the interpled Policy funds in the second phase of these proceedings. Counsel for MetLife shall serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on all parties within thirty (30) days after the date it is electronically filed. (Zignago, K.)
|
May 5, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/16. Leave is hereby granted for Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ("MetLife") to deposit with the Court Clerk its check made payable to the "Clerk of the Court, U.S. District Court, Eastern District of California," check number 001916856 in the amount of $24,228.49, representing the benefits owed under the MetLife policy issued to Clyde Monks.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?