Goods v. McCumber, et al.
Plaintiff: Gregory Goods
Defendant: Jeffery McCumber, D. Hamad, P. Kemp, J. R. Bradford, D. Triche, A. Dennehy and Special Appearance
Case Number: 2:2014cv02580
Filed: November 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/12/2019 ORDERING, in accordance with the 79 "referral notice", the court finds that plaintiff's appeal of the 2/5/2019 dismissal of this action is taken in good faith. (cc: Ninth Circuit) (Yin, K)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/19 DENYING plaintiff's 71 request for a fourth extension of time. (Kastilahn, A)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/1/18 GRANTING 67 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order to file objections to 64 Findings and Recommendations. No further extensions of time will be granted. (Coll, A)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/18 GRANTING 65 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of this order in which to file his objections to the findings and recommendations. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed within seven days thereafter. (Coll, A)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/05/18 ORDERING that defendants' request to take judicial notice (ECF No. 52-2) is GRANTED; RECOMMENDING that the Motion to Dismiss be granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/16/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff a copy of plaintiff's 5/29/18 opposition, without the banner across the top 60 . Within 21 days, plaintiff shall re-file a signed and complete opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/19/2018 DULY NOTING 54 Motion for Trial by Jury, and Plaintiff shall refrain from filing further motions for jury trial, and GRANTING 55 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an opposition to 52 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' reply, if any, to be filed 7 days thereafter. (Henshaw, R)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/27/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Gregory Goods at 1:30 p.m. on 12/20/2017 in Courtroom #25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Henshaw, R)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/26/17 DENYING 39 plaintiff's motion without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/2017 PARTIALLY GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants are relieved of their obligation to file a responsive pleading until further order of this court. (Henshaw, R)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/2017 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigne d DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) (Henshaw, R)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER adopting 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/23/17: Plaintiff's claims against Virga, Green and Arent are dismissed without prejudice. This action proceeds on Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendants. (Kaminski, H)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2017 ORDERING service is appropriate for J. R. Bradford, A. Dennehy, D. Hamad, P. Kemp, and D. Triche. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against Virga, Green and Arent be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Gregory Goods signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/23/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to t he Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/5/15 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed on December 9, 2014 8 are vacated; and Defendants are directed to file and serve one or more declarations addressing (i) whether defendant was provided with sufficient copies of his petition for a writ of habeas corpus to make a timely and complete submission with the California Supreme Court, as ordered by the court on November 14, 2014, and if he was not so provided, (ii ) the reasons for the omission, and (iii) what steps defendants are taking to ensure that plaintiff can make a proper filing with the California Supreme Court, particularly in light of the fact that it appears plaintiff has missed his filing deadline. These declarations must be filed with the court and served on defendant no later than January 12, 2015, at 4:30 p.m.(Dillon, M)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/9/2014 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 1 complaint be dismissed with prejudice, with the proviso that this dismissal shall not act as a bar to plaintiff filing a pe tition for writ of habeas corpus at the federal level once he properly exhausts State collateral review with respect to the judgment or claim he is challenging at the California Supreme Court; plaintiff's 2 request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be denied as moot; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/14/14 ADOPTING 5 Findings and Recommendations in full and GRANTING 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Donati, J)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/6/2014 ORDERING the clerk to randomly assign a District Judge and to serve a copy of this order on Monica Anderson and the Warden of CSP- Sacramento. District J udge Troy L. Nunley RANDOMLY ASSIGNED to this case. It is HEREBY RECOMMENDED that 3 Plaintiff's Motion be partially granted. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that defendants be directed to provide plaintiff with as many copies of his petition for ha beas corpus as are required to make a complete submission with the Calfornia Supreme Court in sufficient time to meet his 11/25/2014 deadline and provide plaintiff with one additional copy. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 7 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (CC- Monica Anderson) (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goods v. McCumber, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Goods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery McCumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hamad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. R. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Triche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Appearance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?