Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Dolan
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Eileen Dolan
Case Number: 2:2014cv02591
Filed: November 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/14/2015 ORDERING that the 6 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED. This action is REMANDED to Butte County Superior Court. The Clerk is directed to serve a certified copy of this order on the Clerk of the Butte County Superior Court. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/5/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 8 motion to remand, filed 12/23/2014, is DENIED AS MOOT. (Kastilahn, A)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/21/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be remanded to Butte County Superior Court. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Noah M. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?