Raley v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: |
Stephen Raley |
Defendant: |
Bob Williams, Burt Bundy, Steve Chamblin, Sandy Bruce, Arthur Wylene, Bill Goodwin, Tim Potanovic, Dave Hencratt, Kurt Rulofson, Beverly Ross, Julie Benson and The Board of Supervisors of Tehama County |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02652 |
Filed: |
November 13, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Tehama |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig M. Kellison |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2019 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/24/2019 REVOKING plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Pro Se Unit at the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc: USCA) (Zignago, K.)
|
March 8, 2019 |
Filing
27
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/7/2019 RECOMMENDING that 22 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Referred to Judge District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
|
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/18/2018 ADOPTED in PART and REJECTED in PART the Findings and Recommendations 17 ; Defendants' 8 motion to dismiss is GRANTED; Plaintiff's due process and equal protection claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; Plaintiff's excessive fine and state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice; and Plaintiff has 20 days to file an amended complaint on the claims not subject to dismissal with prejudice; Defendants shall file their responsive pleading to the amended complaint within 20 days thereafter.(Reader, L)
|
August 23, 2018 |
Filing
17
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/23/2018 RECOMMENDING that the 8 Motion to Dismiss be granted, the 1 Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend, and the Clerk of the Court be directed to enter judgment and close this case. Referred to District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (York, M)
|
January 25, 2018 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/24/2018 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days. (York, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?