Maxwell v. Holder, et al
Plaintiff: Valentina S. Maxwell
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr., Jeh Charles, Lori Scialabba, Monica E. Toro, Michael Biggs and Mari Carmen-Jordan
Case Number: 2:2014cv02772
Filed: November 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/1/2020 DENYING Plaintiff's application for naturalization. To the extent the government's 94 Motion to Dismiss seeks to establish that Plaintiff is ine ligible for naturalization and so her application should be denied, the Motion is GRANTED. In all other respects, it is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Stay of Removal is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/27/18 ORDERING that 69 the findings and recommendations are ADOPTED as to the DENIAL without prejudice of plaintiff's 22 Motions for Summary Judgment and the DENIAL of plaintiff's [ 42] Motion for A Permanent Injunction. The findings and recommendations are DENIED as MOOT as to the DENIAL of Defendants' 59 Motion to Remand. The findings and recommendations are ADOPTED as to the magistrate judge's recommendation tha t the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services be ordered to VACATE the 9/8/2015 decision denying Plaintiff's naturalization application. A Status Conference is SET for 1/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kastilahn, A)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/30/2018 ORDERING that defendants shall notify the court within 7 days of any developments in the removal proceedings, including plaintiff's arrest pursuant to a warrant, that may have material effect on plaintiff's immigration status or the status of this case. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendants' 59 motion for remand be DENIED. Plaintiff's 22 motion for summary judgment be DENIED witho ut prejudice. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services be ordered to vacate the 9/8/2015 decision denying plaintiff's naturalization application. Plaintiff's 42 motion for a permanent injunction be DENIED. Motions referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/1/18 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a responsive brief on the issue of remand only no later than 11/7/18. The hearing currently set for 11/7/18 is hereby VACATED and RE-SET on 11/14/18 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Becknal, R)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/2018 ADOPTING 55 Findings and Recommendations in full. Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/25/18 ORDERING that, A hearing on Defendants' anticipated dispositive Motion is set for 11/7/18, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. In accordance with Local Rule 230, Defendants' Motion shall be filed no later than 10/10/18, and Plaintiff's response shall be due no later than 10/24/18. Plaintiff's Motion for a permanent injunction 42 will be heard concurrently with Defendants� 39; Motion on 11/7/18. In accordance with Local Rule 230, Defendants' response shall be due no later than 10/24/18, and Plaintiff's optional reply shall be due no later than 10/31/18. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 22 is RESTORED to calendar, and will also be heard on 11/7/18. Though the matter is fully briefed, the parties are granted leave to file optional supplemental briefs. Both Plaintiff and Defendant may file supplemental briefing on this matter no later than 10/31/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/20/2015 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 32 are ADOPTED in FULL; Defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; Plaintiff's 22 motion for summary judgment and request for judicial notice is DENIED as MOOT. (Reader, L)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/16/15 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 42 first amended motion for preliminary injunction be DENIED. Motion referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/15/15 RECOMMENDING that the 19 Motion to Dismiss be granted and the complaint be dismissed without prejudice, and that the 22 Motion for Summary Judgment be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/6/15 ORDERING that the 4/15/15 hearing on Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS 19 and Plaintiff's MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 22 is CONTINUED to 5/6/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/10/15 ORDERING that the Clerk shall reassign this case to another Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, notify the parties, and make appropriate adjustments in the assignments of civil cases to compensate for such reassignment. This case is hereby REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Henceforth, the new case number is 2:14-cv-02772 TLN AC (PS). (Kastilahn, A)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY THE USM signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/21/15. The Clerk is directed to forward to the USM the instructions for service of process, the completed summons, copies of the complaint, copies of the form Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, and a copy of this order. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/8/2015 DEFERRING 8 Request for Service of Process by the U.S. Marshal pending receipt of a properly completed USM-285 Form for each named defendant; ORDERING the plaintiff to complete the att ached Notice of Submission of Documents and to submit to the court, the completed Notice of Submission of Documents, one completed summons, one completed USM-285 Form for each named defendant, and seven copies of the endorsed 1 Complaint, upon rece ipt of said documents, the court will direct the U.S Marshal to serve the defendants without payment of costs; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that service of summons must be completed within 120 days of the filing of the original complaint in this action. (Michel, G)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/3/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Within 120 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall serve defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) and shall file the affidavit of service required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(l). Failure to timely serve defendants may result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Holder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina S. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Scialabba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica E. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Carmen-Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?