Garrett v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shane Garrett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv02774
Filed: November 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/10/2017 AWARDING the plaintiff attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $7,000.00 under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). (Michel, G.)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/10/2017 GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 13 Motion for Summary Judgment and 17 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Commissioner's Decision is REVERSED and this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED.(Donati, J)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/8/2015 ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to file her brief by 10/8/2015. (Michel, G.)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/4/2015 ORDERING 14 that Defendant shall have until 10/5/2015 to file her brief. (Reader, L)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/13/15 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM within 14 days, and a statement within 5 days thereafter with the court regarding submission. The USM is directed to serve process within 60 days. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Garrett
Represented By: Wade Sterling Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?