Puckett v. Agboli et al
Plaintiff: Durrell Puckett
Defendant: A. Agboli, Lynch, Dayson, R. Bulawin, D. Yaroch, Lius and Romeo Vallar
Case Number: 2:2014cv02776
Filed: November 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/17/2023 DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's 128 request for the appointment of counsel and access to mental health records. (Yin, K)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/03/22 DENYING 122 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice.(Licea Chavez, V)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/28/2021 DENYING 120 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/17/2021 DENYING without prejudice to renewal with proper affidavits 107 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses. (Henshaw, R)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/21/2020 DENYING 110 and 112 Motions to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/12/20 DENYING 100 Motion to suppress. (Plummer, M)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 08/13/19 DENYING 80 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall file a status report consistent with the court's 6/14/19 order within 30 days of the date of this order; and defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days after service of plaintiff's status report. (Plummer, M)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 06/14/19 ORDERING plaintiff's status report shall be filed and served within 30 days from the date of service of this order. Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days after service of plaintiff's status report. The clerk of the court is directed to mail to all parties the form "Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge," together with the instant order. (Plummer, M)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/10/19 ADOPTING the findings and recommendations filed 2/4/19, in full; GRANTING Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 63 ) as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment safety and me dical care claims against defendants Lynch and Luis; DENYING Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 63 ) as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claims against defendants Agboli, Yaroch, Lynch, Vallar, Bulawin, and Dayson; and DENYING the Defendants' motion requiring plaintiff to post security (Doc. 67 ). (Becknal, R)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 02/04/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 63 be granted as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment safety and medical care claims againts defendant s Lynch and Luis. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 63 be denied as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claims against defendants Agboli, Yaroch, Lynch, Vallar, Bulawin and Dayson. Defendants motion requiring plaintiff to post security 67 be denied. Motions 63 , 67 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/9/2018 ADOPTING 57 findings and recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The matter is REFERRED back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/20/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 51 motion to compel. (Yin, K)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/16/18 DENYING 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/13/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a District Judge and update the docket to reflect the new case number. Assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez. The new case number is: 2:14-cv-2776 JAM CMK (PC). (Henshaw, R)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/22/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 37 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/26/2018 ORDERING defendant Lynch to pay the U.S. Marshal $235.40 within 14 days from the date of this order, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. (Henshaw, R)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/29/2018 GRANTING 29 and 32 Defendants Agboli, Dayson, Bulawin, Yaroch, Luis, and Vallar Motions to Set Aside Default; SETTING ASIDE 19 Clerk's Entry of Default; GRANTING 28 Defendan t Lynch's Motion for Extension of Time; and DENYING as MOOT 20 Motion for Default Judgment, 22 Motion to Enforce Payment, and 24 Motion for Entry of Default. Defendants have 30 days from the date of this order to file a response to the complaint. (Henshaw, R)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/31/16 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Durrell Anthony Puckett. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/30/16 ORDERING that the court will disregard plaintiff's prematurely filed 4 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff may re-file his motion for summary judgment at the appropriate time. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puckett v. Agboli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durrell Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Agboli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bulawin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Yaroch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Vallar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?