Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC v. Hargan
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC and Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC a Delaware limited liability company Doing business as Shasta Regional Medical Center
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell, Secretary Alex Azar and Eric D. Hargan
Case Number: 2:2014cv02791
Filed: November 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/10/18 DISMISSING this action with prejudice in its entirety, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. (Kaminski, H)
August 9, 2018 Filing 91 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Alex Azar. (Broderick, Gregory) Modified on 8/10/2018 (Washington, S).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/20/18 ORDERING that the time for Federal Defendants to file Reply Brief is EXTENDED to 8/20/2018. The Motion hearing as to #84 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 9/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 18, 2018 Filing 89 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend Time for Federal Defendants to File Reply Brief and Continue Hearing to Sept. 6, 2018 by Alex Azar. (Broderick, Gregory)
July 12, 2018 Filing 88 BRIEF by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC in OPPOSITION to #84 Motion to Dismiss. (Farag, Shareef) Modified on 7/16/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/28/2018 EXTENDING Briefing Schedule on #84 Motion to Dismiss as follows: Opposition Filed on or before 7/12/2018. Reply Filed on or before 7/26/2018. Motion Hearing RESET for 8/9/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 25 (KJN), before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (York, M)
June 26, 2018 Filing 86 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Stipulated Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Farag, Shareef)
May 31, 2018 Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/31/2018: On the Court's own motion and due to unavailability, the 7/26/2018 hearing on defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #84 ) is RESET for 8/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
May 31, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION to DISMISS by Alex Azar. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Broderick, Gregory) Modified on 6/4/2018 (Zignago, K.).
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/2018 ORDERING an extension of time in which defendant may respond to the Second Amended Complaint; Response due 5/31/2018. It is further ORDERED that the court ADOPT the briefing schedule set forth in the #82 Stipulation; Motion filed by 5/31/2018; Opposition due 6/28/2018; Reply due 7/12/2018; Hearing on 7/26/2018 at 10:00AM. (Fabillaran, J)
May 1, 2018 Filing 82 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend Time for Federal Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motion by Alex Azar. (Broderick, Gregory)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/9/18 GRANTING an Extension of Time for the defendant to respond to #77 Second Amended Complaint up to and including May 2, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
March 27, 2018 Filing 80 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Federal Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Alex Azar. (Broderick, Gregory)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/14/2018 GRANTING an Extension of Time for the defendant to respond to #77 Second Amended Complaint until 4/4/2018.(Hunt, G)
March 1, 2018 Filing 78 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Initial Extension to Respond to SAC re #77 Amended Complaint by Alex Azar. Attorney Broderick, Gregory T. added. (Broderick, Gregory)
January 17, 2018 Filing 77 CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sylvia Mathews Burwell by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC.(Farag, Shareef)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/9/2018 ORDERING the following actions are consolidated for all purposes, including trial and all pretrial matters: 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00154-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00324-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00400-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00450-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00473-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-00474-TLN-KJN;. 2:15-cv-00709-TLN-KJN; 2:15-cv-01120-TLN-KJN; 2:16-cv-00230-TLN-KJN; 2:16-cv-02278-TLN-KJN; and 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-KJN; Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date this Order is entered to file the Proposed consolidated Complaint. That filing shall be docketed solely on the docket for Case No. 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN. Going forward no filing should be made under any of the other case numbers listed in the preceding paragraph; Defendant shall have forty-five (45) days after service of the Proposed Consolidated Complaint to file an answer. (Becknal, R)
December 27, 2017 Filing 75 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Gregory T. Broderick for Sylvia Mathews Burwell, attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, cv terminated (Broderick, Gregory)
December 19, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE Related Actions and Extend Time for Filing Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farag, Shareef) Modified on 12/29/2017 (Zignago, K.).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/18/17. Added attorney Ian K. Byrnside, PHV for Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Benson, A.)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/18/17. Added attorney S. Derek Bauer, PHV for Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Benson, A.)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/19/17 ORDERING that the Motion to Consolidate Cases #68 is DENIED without prejudice. However, as the parties agree that attorneys for Plaintiff need time to familiarize themselves with this case, Plaintiff may file a Motion to Consolidate attaching its proposed amended complaint as an exhibit within sixty (60) days of the date this Order is filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 17, 2017 Filing 70 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC for attorney S. Derek Bauer to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7316693) (Pearson, Matthew)
October 17, 2017 Filing 69 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC for attorney Ian K. Byrnside to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7316687) (Pearson, Matthew)
October 4, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES and MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to File Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew)
September 12, 2017 Filing 67 STATUS REPORT re Second Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Pearson, Matthew)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/1/17: Plaintiff should file a properly noticed motion to consolidate pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). (Kaminski, H)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/1/17: Attorney Matthew D. Pearson added for Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Samuel Joel Romero terminated. (Kaminski, H)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/1/17: Attorney Shareef Farag added for Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Ronald S. Hodges terminated. (Kaminski, H)
August 16, 2017 Filing 63 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate the Actions and to Continue Plaintiff's Deadline to File Its Amended Complaint by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew)
August 14, 2017 Filing 62 PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
August 14, 2017 Filing 61 PROPOSED SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
August 1, 2017 Filing 60 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Shareef Farag on behalf of Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Farag, Shareef added. (Farag, Shareef)
August 1, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Pearson on behalf of Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Pearson, Matthew D. added. (Pearson, Matthew)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/17/2017 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #52 in each of these actions are VACATED; Defendant's #28 Motion to Dismiss filed in each of these actions is GRANTED; these actions are DISMISSED, but Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days leave to amend. (Reader, L)
June 6, 2017 Filing 57 RESPONSE to #54 Objections to Findings and Recommendations by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Montoya, Bobbie)
May 23, 2017 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Samuel J. Romero re #54 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Romero, Samuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 55 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC in re #54 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Romero, Samuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 54 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #52 by Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 53 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #52 by Defendant Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Montoya, Bobbie)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 [VACATED SEE ORDER [ #58 ]FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/9/17 RECOMMENDING that Defendant's motion to dismiss filed in each of these actions be GRANTED. These actions be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court be directed to vacate all dates and close these cases. Matter referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties.(Kastilahn, A) Modified on 7/17/2017 (Reader, L).
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RELATING CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/19/17 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:17-cv-00072-TLN-CMK, 2:17-cv-00071-WBS-CMK, 2:17-cv- 00073-MCE-CMK, 2:17-cv-00082-MCE-CMK, 2:17-cv-00069-TLN-CMK, and 2:17-cv-00074-WBS-CMK are hereby REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned cases are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as: 2:17-cv-00072-TLN-KJN 2:17-cv-00071-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00073-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00082-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00069-TLN-KJN, and 2:17-cv-00074-TLN-KJN, respectively. (Becknal, R)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/15/2016 REFERRING #28 all pending Motion to Dismiss in the LEAD action and the RELATED CASES to Magistrate Judge Newman for Findings and Recommendations; ADDITIONALLY the Court ORDERS that all future motions to dismiss or motions to amend be noticed before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Reader, L)
December 15, 2016 Filing 49 RESPONSE to 48 Minute Order by Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
December 1, 2016 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on December 1, 2016: Upon review of the parties' Joint Statement filed on November 9, 2016 (ECF No. #45 ), the Court asks Plaintiff to indicate whether it consents to sending the pending motions to dismiss, in the instant case and all related cases, before the Magistrate Judge for Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff shall notify the Court of its decision within fourteen (14) days of this order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RELATING CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/21/2016 ORDERING that cases 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN, 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-CMK, and 2:16-cv-02278-VC are RELATED. The actions denominated 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-CMK and 2:16-cv-02278-VC are hereby REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned cases are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as: 2:16-cv-02521-TLN-KJN and 2:16-cv-02278-TLN-KJN, respectively. The case denominated 2:14-cv-02791-TLN-KJN is designated the lead case for the purposes of relating any future cases. (Zignago, K.)
November 17, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:15-cv-00154, 2:15-cv-00324, 2:15-cv-00400, 2:15-cv-00450, 2:15-cv-00473, 2:15-cv-00474, 2:15-cv-00709, 2:15-cv-01120, 2:16-cv-00230, 2:16-cv-02521 by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Romero, Samuel)
November 9, 2016 Filing 45 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Court's Proposal to Appoint Special Master by Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Romero, Samuel Joel added. (Romero, Samuel) Modified on 11/10/2016 (Zignago, K.).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/2/16 ORDERING the parties to meet and confer within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order and file a joint statement apprising the Court of whether they will consent to the appointment of a special master.(Washington, S) (Main Document 44 replaced on 11/2/2016) (Washington, S).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/28/2016 GRANTING #40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Andrew H. Selesnick, Damaris L. Medina, and Ketakee R. Kane are WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiff Prime Healthcare Services Shasta, LLC. (Butolph, J)
October 25, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL: Attorney Ronald S. Hodges ADDED for Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Hodges, Ronald) Modified on 10/26/2016 (Michel, G.).
August 17, 2016 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/17/2016: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (ECF No. #40 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 8/25/2016 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 19, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY of Andrew H. Selesnick, Damaris L. Medina, and Ketakee R. Kane by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed)(Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 7/20/2016 (Jackson, T).
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/19/2016 RELATED with case(s) 2:14-CV-2791 TLN KJN, 2:16-CV-230 MCE KJN. REASSIGNING CASE 2:16-CV-230 to District Judge Troy L. Nunley for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:16-CV-230 TLN KJN.(Reader, L)
April 1, 2016 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/1/2016: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #28 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 4/7/2016 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 24, 2016 Filing 37 AMENDED #36 REPLY BRIEF in support of #28 Motion to Dismiss by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Montoya, Bobbie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 36 REPLY by Sylvia Mathews Burwell ins upport of #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Montoya, Bobbie)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/23/2016 CONTINUING the hearing on #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to 4/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; ORDERING the defendant to file and serve a reply brief, if any, by 3/24/2016. (Michel, G.)
February 22, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing the hearing on #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 2/23/2016 (Michel, G.).
January 28, 2016 Filing 33 OPPOSITION by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC to #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Kane, Ketakee)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/13/2016 ORDERING that the hearing on Defendant's pending motion to dismiss shall be heard on March 10, 2016; Plaintiff's opposition to the pending motions to dismiss, if any, shall be filed and served by no later than January 28, 2016; and, Defendant's reply briefs, if any, shall be filed and served no later February 25, 2016. (Becknal, R)
January 12, 2016 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading re #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 1/13/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/23/15 GRANTING the following briefing schedule: Deadline for Plaintiff's Oppositions to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss: January 14, 2016; Deadline for Defendant's Replies in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: February 11, 2016; Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: February 25, 2016. (Becknal, R)
October 22, 2015 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply re #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee)
October 5, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Montoya, Bobbie)
October 1, 2015 Filing 27 DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL FOR SERVICE: Attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, cv ADDED for Sylvia Mathews Burwell; Attorney Edward A. Olsen, GOVT TERMINATED. (Montoya, Bobbie) Modified on 10/2/2015 (Michel, G.).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/18/2015 ORDERING the defendant to file a responsive pleading to the #23 First Amended Complaint by 10/5/2015. (Michel, G.)
August 17, 2015 Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Olsen, Edward)
July 9, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Ketakee R. Kane. (Kane, Ketakee)
July 2, 2015 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit a)(Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 7/8/2015 (Meuleman, A).
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/2015 ORDERING that the deadline for filing an amended complaint is 7/2/2015 and the deadline for filing a responsive pleading is 9/4/2015. (Zignago, K.)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/2015 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:15-cv-1120 GEB-CMK is hereby REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:15-cv-1120 TNL-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee)
May 29, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:14-cv-02791, 2:15-cv-00154, 2:15-cv-00324, 2:15-cv-00400, 2:15-cv-00450, 2:15-cv-00473, 2:15-cv-00474, 2:15-cv-00709 by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee)
May 29, 2015 Filing 18 [DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE] STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 6/1/2015 (Krueger, M).
May 29, 2015 Filing 17 [DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE] STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. (Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 6/1/2015 (Krueger, M).
May 29, 2015 Filing 16 [DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE] STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Kane, Ketakee R. added. (Kane, Ketakee) Modified on 6/1/2015 (Krueger, M).
May 27, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of assiciation of counsel by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Medina, Damaris L. added. (Medina, Damaris) Modified on 6/1/2015 (Zignago, K.).
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/22/15. Case number 2:14-cv-2791, 2:15-cv-0450, 2:15-cv-0473, 2:15-cv-0474 and 2:15-cv-0709 are hereby related and assigned to Judge Troy N. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. (Manzer, C)
May 19, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bryan Wong on behalf of Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Wong, Bryan added. (Wong, Bryan)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/27/15: This case is related with member cases 2:15-cv-00154-TLN-DAD, 2:15-cv-00324-JAM-CMK, and 2:15-cv-00400-TLN-CMK. (Kaminski, H)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/13/15 ORDERING that the deadline for defendant's responsive pleading is extended to 06/05/15. (Benson, A)
April 9, 2015 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for [Second] Extend the Deadline for a Responsive Pleading by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Olsen, Edward)
April 9, 2015 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for [Second] Extend the Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Olsen, Edward)
April 7, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:15-cv-00154, 2:15-cv-00324, 2:15-cv-00400, 2:15-cv-00450, 2:15-cv-00473, 2:15-cv-00474, 2:15-cv-00709 by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. [Revised] (Olsen, Edward)
March 25, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:15-CV-00324, 2:15-CV-00400, 2:15-CV-00154 by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Olsen, Edward)
March 10, 2015 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for a Resonsive Pleading by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Attorney Olsen, Edward A added. (Olsen, Edward)
January 27, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC served on 1/14/2015, answer due 3/16/2015. (Tomas, Oliver)
December 1, 2014 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
December 1, 2014 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sylvia Mathews Burwell* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Oliver Tomas* *Prime Healthcare Management, Inc.* *3300 East Guasti Road, 3rd Fl* *Ontario, CA 91761*. (Kastilahn, A)
December 1, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC.
December 1, 2014 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-5634331. (Tomas, Oliver)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant by Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC. Attorney Tomas, Oliver De Castro added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Tomas, Oliver) Modified on 12/1/2014 (Kastilahn, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC v. Hargan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Represented By: Bobbie Jo Montoya
Represented By: Edward A. Olsen, GOVT
Represented By: Gregory T. Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex Azar
Represented By: Gregory T. Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric D. Hargan
Represented By: Gregory T. Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S. Hodges
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer, PHV
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Bryan Wong
Represented By: Ian K. Byrnside, PHV
Represented By: Damaris L. Medina
Represented By: Ketakee R. Kane
Represented By: Oliver Tomas
Represented By: Samuel Joel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Shasta, LLC a Delaware limited liability company Doing business as Shasta Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Ronald S. Hodges
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer, PHV
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Bryan Wong
Represented By: Ian K. Byrnside, PHV
Represented By: Damaris L. Medina
Represented By: Ketakee R. Kane
Represented By: Oliver Tomas
Represented By: Samuel Joel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?