Schmidt v. Thinh et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Glenn Schmidt
Defendant: Tan Thinh, Dean Archibald and Marjorie Koller
Case Number: 2:2014cv02868
Filed: December 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/29/15 ORDERING that after review of the record herein, the court determines that plaintiffs appeal is frivolous and his in forma pauperis status on appeal should be revoked. This filing constitutes notification to plaintiff and the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.(Dillon, M)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/14/15 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lonnie Glenn Schmidt signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/04/15. The Sheriff of Sacramento county shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. The clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/20/2015 ORDERING the Clerk to provide plaintiff with another copy of the ifp application used by this court; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a fully completed ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. Thinh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Glenn Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tan Thinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie Koller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?