MyECheck, Inc. v. Seven Miles Securities et al
Plaintiff: MyECheck, Inc.
Defendant: Seven Miles Securities, Titan International Securities, Inc., Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation and Sweetsun Intertrade, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02889
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/10/2018 ORDERING that the deadline for plaintiff to complete service on Titan International is 120 days from the date of this order. The deadline for plaintiff to file its renewed motion for default judgment as to defendant Sweetsun Intertrade, Inc. also is 120 days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/14/17 ORDERING that the Motion for Leave to Amend 76 is GRANTED and MEC shall be and hereby is granted leave of Court to file its SAC. The SAC filed concurrently with the Motion shall be deemed filed as of this day, and MEC is ordered to forthwith attempt service of the SAC on the named parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/30/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to show cause within seven (7) days, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Michel, G.)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying without prejudice Mr. Katz's 56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/1/16. (Kastilahn, A)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER adopting 52 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/2/16: Plaintiff's motions for default judgment, ECF Nos. 39, 44, are denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted thirty days to file an amended complaint. (Kaminski, H)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/30/16 ORDERING the Clerk to serve this order on Sweetsun Intertrade, Inc. and Titan International Securities, Inc. and RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 39 , [44 ] Motions for Default Judgment be denied without prejudice and that plaintiff be granted 30 days from the issuance of the District Judge's order to file an amended complaint; referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/7/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file a motion seeking entry of default judgment as to Sweetsun Intertrade, Inc. by 1/11/2016. Defendant Titan International Securities, Inc. has been served. If Titan does not timely respond to the complaint, plaintiff shall promptly seek entry of default and move for default judgment. A further Status Conference is set for 2/18/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall file a joint status report no less than seven days before the new date for the status conference. (Zignago, K.)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/2015 ORDERING that the 19 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice and without leave to amend. (Zignago, K.)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/28/2015 ORDERING that plaintiff show cause within fourteen days of the date of this order why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b). (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MyECheck, Inc. v. Seven Miles Securities et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Miles Securities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan International Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Capital Advisors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetsun Intertrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MyECheck, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Robert Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?