United States of America v. Real Property located at 7520 Muirfield Way, Sacramento, California et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property located at 7520 Muirfield Way, Sacramento, California, Real Property located at 7455 Willowwick Way, Sacramento, California, Real Property located at 2381 Kenworthy Way, Sacramento, California and Real Property located at 1724 S Street, Sacramento, California
Case Number: 2:2014cv02941
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/18/15. All parties are to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. The U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California, Hon. Garland E. Burrell, Jr., District Judge, shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture. The Court enters this Certificate of Reasonable Cause pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465, that there was reasonable cause for the posting of the defendant properties and the commencement and prosecution of this forfeiture action. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER and CERTIFICATE OF REASONABLE CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 05/14/15 ORDERING that the Real Property located at 1724 S Street, Sacramento, California (APN: 009-0096-008-0000) is DISMISSED with prejudice; the parties are to bear their own costs and attorney fees. (Benson, A)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 4/17/2015 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED and all further proceedings are taken off calendar until 7/13/2015, at which time the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary. (Zignago, K.)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/13/15 ORDERING that For the reasons set forth above, this matter is stayed pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 981(g) (1), 981(g)(2), and 21 U.S.C. § 881(i) until May 12, 2015, at which time the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary.(Dillon, M)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/22/15 ORDERING that the Office of the Federal Defender is authorized to represent Ashley Chang in this case. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 12/23/14 ORDERING that action No. 2:14-CV-02941 is reassigned to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., and for all further proceedings, and any date currently set in the reassigned case is VAC ATED. Henceforth the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall show the initials GEB-DAD. A Status Conference is SET for 5/4/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior. The Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION and ORDER for PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/19/14. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property located at 7520 Muirfield Way, Sacramento, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 7520 Muirfield Way, Sacramento, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 7455 Willowwick Way, Sacramento, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 2381 Kenworthy Way, Sacramento, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 1724 S Street, Sacramento, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?