Rodriguez v. Wofford
Petitioner: Steven R Rodriguez
Respondent: C. Wofford
Case Number: 2:2014cv02946
Filed: December 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/16/15 ordering petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is summarily dismissed. This case is closed. The court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/19/15 ordering petitioner shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the court or pay the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/30/2014 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven R Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?