November 10, 2015 |
Filing
53
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE dated *11/10/2015* signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/9/2015 ORDERING the Court ADOPTS the Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture entered into by and between parties to this action; Judgment is her eby ENTERED against Matthew Gillum and all other potential claimants who have not filed claims in this action; Upon entry of a Final Judgment of Forfeiture, $92,379.15 of the Approximately $200,979.15 seized from Tradehill, Inc., held in th e name of Megan Thompson, Approximately $53,302.06 seized from Tradehill, Inc., held in the name of Matthew Gillum, 1,238.6004395 Bitcoins seized from Tradehill, Inc., held in the name of Megan Thompson, and 55.87584198 Bitcoins seized from Trad ehill, Inc., held in the name of Matthew Gillum, together with any interest that may have accrued on the total amount seized, shall be forfeited to the US pursuant to 21 U.S.C. Sec 881(a)(6), to be disposed of according to law; Upon entry of a Final Judgment of Forfeiture herein, but no later than 60 days thereafter, $108,600.00 of the Approximately $200,979.15 seized from Tradehill, Inc., held in the name of Megan Thompson, shall be returned to Matthew Gillum; Claimant Matthew Gillum waives any and all claim or right to interest that may have accrued on the defendant assets; all parties are to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees; the USDC EDCA, Hon. Morrison C. England, Jr., District Judge, shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture; Based upon the allegations set forth in the Complaint filed 12/22/2014, and the Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture filed herein, the Court enters this CERTIFICATE OF REASONABLE CAUSE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 2465, that there was reasonable cause for the seizure and arrest of the defendant assets, and for the commencement and prosecution of this forfeiture action. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/30/2015 ORDERING that Claimant may only file the following documents: a. One opposition to any motion filed by plaintiff (and clearly titled as such); b. Only one motion pending at any time. C laimant is limited to one memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion and one reply to any opposition. Claimant is reminded that he currently has a motion pending to declare claimant incompetent; and c. One set of objections to a ny findings and recommendations. Failure to comply with this order shall result in improperly filed documents being stricken from the record and may result in the imposition of sanctions on claimant. The court defers ruling on claimant's 40 incompetency motion pending conclusion of the sentencing hearing in the criminal matter, case no. 2:13-cr-0393 MCE. Within seven days after conclusion of the sentencing hearing, plaintiff shall file a status report advising the court of the Distr ict Court's findings regarding claimant's competency. Claimant's 34 , 35 , 41 , 42 , 43 , 46 , 47 , 48 motions are DENIED. Claimant's 27 , 39 opposition papers to the motion to strike are DISREGARDED. Any argument, po ints and authorities, or evidence claimant intends to file in support of his opposition to the motion to strike must be submitted in one complete document, to be filed no later than 10/21/2015. Piecemeal submissions will not be accepted by the court and will be stricken from the record. (Zignago, K.)
|
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/14/15 ORDERING that claimant's motion for 21 day notice (ECF No. 33 ) is denied as moot. (Becknal, R)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/31/15 ORDERING Claimant's opposition, if any, to 23 Motion to Strike filed by United States of America shall be filed no later than 9/30/15. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 10/9/15. The matter shall thereafter stand submitted. (Meuleman, A)
|
August 25, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/25/15 ORDERING that Claimant's 19 Motion for leave to conduct depositions by written questions is DENIED without prejudice; Claimant's 20 Motion for Clerk to issue subpoenas is DENIED without prejudice. (Benson, A)
|
December 30, 2014 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/30/2014 GRANTING government's 1 Application for Publication. (Marciel, M)
|