Canada v. Hamkar
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Canada
Defendant: Kamkar
Case Number: 2:2014cv02990
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/2017 DISMISSING this action pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/25/2017 ORDERING Defendant to notify the court, within 7 days, whether he has any objection to the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Henshaw, R)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/23/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 60 request and GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to respond to the 7/17/2017 order 58 . The Clerk shall send plaintiff a copy of the 7/17/2017 order and his complaint. (Yin, K)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/17/2017 DENYING without prejudice 56 Motion. Plaintiff to file clarification as to how he wishes to proceed within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/21/17 ordering plaintiff's motions 53 , 54 are denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion for return of his legal materials 51 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/7/2017 VACATING defendant's 25 motion for summary judgment, without prejudice to its renewal. This action is TEMPORARILY STAYED. Within 30 days from plaintiff's release from CMF/DSH custody and the return of his legal materials, plaintiff shall file a request to lift the stay; if plaintiff fails to file such a request, defendant may file a request to lift the stay. The Clerk shall administratively terminate this action. (Yin, K)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/2017 VACATING 42 Plaintiff's deadline to oppose the pending motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall address the issues concerning plaintiff's legal materials and the proposed stay within 21 days of this order. (Henshaw, R) Modified on 5/3/2017 (Donati, J).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/10/17 ordering Plaintiffs motions and requests for an Olsen review 36 , 37 , and 40 are denied. Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time 41 is granted. Plaintiff is granted forty-five days from the date of this order in which to file and serve his opposition. No further extensions of time will be granted absent substantial cause. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, counsel for defendant shall file a status report as set forth above. (Plummer, M)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/20/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 31 , 34 motions for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/17 ORDERING that plaintiff is granted 60 days from the date of this action in which to file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment; no further extensions of time will be granted; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of his complaint (ECF No. 1 ). (Dillon, M)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/16 ordering that within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 06/07/16 adopting 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiffs motion for injunctive relief 17 is denied. (Plummer, M)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/28/16 ORDERING that Plaintiffs amended complaint (ECF No. 17 ) is STRICKEN; Plaintiffs motion for the appointment of counsel (ECF No. 16 ) is DENIED without pre judice; Defendants request to extend the discovery deadline (ECF No. 20 ) is GRANTED; The discovery deadline is continued to July 1, 2016, and the pretrial motions deadline is continued to September 23, 2016; and it is RECOMMENDED that plaintiffs motion for injunctive relief (ECF No. 17 ) be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronald Lee Canada signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/02/15. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canada v. Hamkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?