Mulgrew v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Mulgrew, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Green Tree Servicing LLC and Green Tree Lending, Inc |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02998 |
Filed: |
December 30, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Butte |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig M. Kellison |
Presiding Judge: |
Morrison C. England |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
41
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/22/2016 RECOMMENDING that the Defendant's 19 motion to dismiss be granted; Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without leave to amend; and the clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England; Objections are due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Jackson, T)
|
July 20, 2016 |
Filing
24
ORDER denying plaintiff's 23 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/20/16. (Kastilahn, A)
|
April 11, 2016 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/8/16 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS issued 10/22/15 12 are VACATED; Plaintiff's MOTION to vacate the order for dismissal 13 is GRANTED to the extent that the recommendat ion for dismissal is vacated; the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the order authorizing service (Doc. 8 ), a new summons, a USM-285 form, a copy of the complaint, and new case documents; and Plaintiff is required to effect service of process either through the USM or on his own pursuant to FRCP 4, as set forth above. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
October 22, 2015 |
Filing
12
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/21/15 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules andorders. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/21/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons in a civil case, the undersigned's new case documents, and an or der setting this matter for an initial scheduling conference. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff the summons, a USM-285 form, and a copy of the complaint. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the summons by indicating the addresses of the named defendants and shall submit to the United States Marshal. Within 20 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a notice indicating that the documents described above have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Zignago, K.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?